EP1334208 - METHOD FOR MARKING CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friz Biochem GmbH Nibelungenstrasse 10 80639 München / DE | [2003/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTWICH, Gerhard Nibelungenstrasse 10 80639 München / DE | 02 /
BANDILLA, Michael Max-Dörner-Weg 1 82234 Wessling / DE | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/41] |
Former [2004/21] | Grape, Knut, Dipl.-Ing. Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Kritzenberger, Jürgen Hermann, Dr. Hedwigstrasse 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01971604.2 | 04.08.2001 | [2003/33] | WO2001DE03009 | Priority number, date | DE2000141766 | 25.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10041766 | [2003/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0216635 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1334208 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/53 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
G01N33/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MARKIERUNG CHEMISCHER SUBSTANZEN | [2003/33] | English: | METHOD FOR MARKING CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES | [2003/33] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LE MARQUAGE DE SUBSTANCES CHIMIQUES | [2003/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 02.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 16.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.02.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.02.2004 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2004/22] | 27.09.2004 | Resumption of proceedings | [2004/22] | 28.02.2005 | Resumption of proceedings | [2004/45] | 01.02.2004 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2004/45] | Cited in | International search | [X]US5985548 (EBERSOLE RICHARD CALVIN ET AL) [X] 1-33 * column W *; | [X]WO9632640 (CIBA CORNING DIAGNOSTICS CORP) [X] 1-33 * column W *; | [X]WO9963109 (BAXTER AG ;TURECEK PETER (AT); SCHWARZ HANS PETER (AT); SIEKMANN J) [X] 1-33 * page 5 - page 14 *; | [Y]US5665539 (SMITH CASSANDRA L ET AL) [Y] 1-33 * column W *; | [Y]EP0530998 (MICROGENICS CORP) [Y] 1-33 * example 1 *; | [Y]EP0314904 (MERCK PATENT GMBH) [Y] 1-33 * examples 1,6,7; claims 1-7 * | [XY] - JOERGER R D ET AL, "ANALYTE DETECTION WITH DNA-LABELED ANTIBODIES AND POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. WINSTON, US, (199509), vol. 41, no. 9, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1371 - 1377, XP001018334 [X] 1-8 * column W * [Y] 9-33 | [XY] - HENDRICKSON EDWIN R ET AL, "High sensitivity multianalyte immunoassay using covalent DNA-labeled antibodies and polymerase chain reaction", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1995), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 522 - 529, XP002151883 [X] 1-8 * column W * [Y] 9-33 | [XY] - CASE MARIAN C ET AL, "Enhanced ultrasensitive detection of structurally diverse antigens using a single immuno-PCR assay protocol.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (19990201), vol. 223, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 93 - 106, XP002234679 [X] 1-8 * page 95 - page 102; figure 1 * [Y] 9-33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(98)00207-5 | [XY] - NIEMEYER CHRISTOF M ET AL, "Self-assembly of DNA-streptavidin nanostructures and their use as reagents in immuno-PCR.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19991201), vol. 27, no. 23, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4553 - 4561, XP002176567 [X] 1-8 * column W * [Y] 9-33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/27.23.4553 | [Y] - SIMMONDS, A., CUNNINGHAM, M., "The preparation of protein-nucleic acid conjugates", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1998), vol. 130, no. 19, Database accession no. 248388z, XP008014161 [Y] 1-33 * page 483 - page 503 * | [ ] - ASLAM, MOHAMMED, Bioconjugation, LONDON, UK, NYCOMED AMERSHAM, (1998) [ ] * page 483 - page 503 * | [Y] - VARY, CALVIN P.H., "Nonisotopic DNA labelling strategies", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1996), vol. 125, no. 25, Database accession no. 318836z, XP008014182 [Y] 1-33 * page 47 - page 65 * | [ ] - DANGLER, CHARLES A., Nucleic Acid Analysis, NEW YORK, N.Y., WILEY, (1996) [ ] * page 47 - page 65 * |