11.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
15.02.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
09.03.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
07.03.2007 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.02.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.02.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.09.2006 |
First examination report |
|
20.09.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.09.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
01.11.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
01.11.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
12.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2003 |
Change - inventor |
published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] |
18.04.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |
18.04.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |
09.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|