EP1315979 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A ROTATIONAL ANGLE OR A DISTANCE BY EVALUATING PHASE MEASURED VALUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/15] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINLECHNER, Siegbert In Den Ziegelwiesen 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
WENZLER, Axel Regenbogenweg 16 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2003/30] |
Former [2003/23] | 01 /
STEINLECHNER, Siegbert In Den Ziegelwiesen 71229 Leonberg / DE | ||
02 /
WENZLER, Axel Bogenerstrasse 9f 70569 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01971659.6 | 31.08.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001DE03291 | Priority number, date | DE2000142660 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10042660 | [2003/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0218971 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315979 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315979 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01S11/04, G01B7/30 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
G01D5/2452 (EP,US);
G01S17/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES DREHWINKELS ODER ABSTANDES DURCH AUSWERTUNG VON PHASENMESSWERTEN | [2003/23] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A ROTATIONAL ANGLE OR A DISTANCE BY EVALUATING PHASE MEASURED VALUES | [2003/23] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER UN ANGLE DE ROTATION OU UN ECARTEMENT PAR EVALUATION DE VALEURS DE MESURE DE PHASE | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 19.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.04.2007 | ES | 22.07.2007 | [2008/20] |
Former [2007/47] | ES | 22.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0693693 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 32 * |