EP1312184 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASSIGNING ACCESS MECHANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBBS, Jonathan, Alastair 48 Stainer Way, Hedge End Southampton, Hampshire SO30 2XF / GB | 02 /
AFTELAK, Stephen, Basil 80 Okus Road Swindon, Wiltshire SN1 4JP / GB | 03 /
BADEN, Charlotte, Catherine 4 Cartmell Court, Imgram Street Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 9HL / GB | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Jepsen, René Pihl, et al Eltima Consulting Grove House, Lutyens Close' Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hants RG24 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Jepsen, René Pihl, et al Eltima Consulting Grove House, Lutyens Close' Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hants RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Jepsen, Rene Pihl, et al Eltima Consulting Shaftesbury Centre Percy Street Swindon SN2 2AZ / GB | ||
Former [2003/21] | McCormack, Derek James Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01971876.6 | 06.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001EP09079 | Priority number, date | GB20000020303 | 18.08.2000 Original published format: GB 0020303 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0217565 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1312184 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312184 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H04L12/5692 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/09] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR ZUWEISUNG VON ZUGRIFFSMECHANISMEN | [2003/21] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASSIGNING ACCESS MECHANISMS | [2003/21] | French: | AFFECTATION D'UN MECANISME D'ACCES | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 13.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2009 | BE | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | IT | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | IE | 06.08.2009 | LU | 06.08.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IE | 06.08.2009 | ||
LU | 06.08.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IE | 06.08.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IE | 06.08.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
IE | 06.08.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 11.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6006264 (COLBY STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13,16,21 * column 5, line 4 - column 19, line 62; figure - *; | [PX]US6108307 (MCCONNELL STEPHEN M [CA], et al) [PX] 1,2,13,16,21 * column 4, line 1 - column 9, line 65; figure - *; | [PX]US6188698 (GALAND CLAUDE [FR], et al) [PX] 1,2,13,16,21 * column 5, line 2 - column 13, line 54; figure - *; | [PX]WO0124428 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,13,21 * page 8, line 21 - page 36, line 19; figure - *; | [E]WO0186466 (SURF COMM SOLUTIONS LTD [IL], et al) [E] 1,2,13,16,21* page 6, line 30 - page 18, line 10; figure - * |