EP1320463 - MACHINE FOR SEALED COVER FOR A SET OF DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Immeuble le Triangle 9 rue Paul Lafargue 93210 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Immeuble le Triangle 9 rue Paul Lafargue 93210 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states SECAP (Groupe Pitney Bowes) 21, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states SECAP 21, Quai Alphonse le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMEZ, Angel Les Cloupiers F-07210 Alissas / FR | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Petit, Maxime Santarelli 14, Avenue de la Grande Armée BP 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Petit, Maxime Santarelli 14, Avenue de la Grande Armée BP 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2003/26] | Petit, Maxime Cabinet Rinuy, Santarelli Conseils en Propriété industrielle B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01972230.5 | 28.09.2001 | [2003/26] | WO2001FR03018 | Priority number, date | FR20000012479 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: FR 0012479 | [2003/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0226508 | Date: | 04.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1320463 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1320463 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B43M3/04 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
B43M3/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUM KUVERTIEREN EINER MENGE VON DOKUMENTEN | [2003/26] | English: | MACHINE FOR SEALED COVER FOR A SET OF DOCUMENTS | [2003/26] | French: | MACHINE DE MISE SOUS PLI D'UN ENSEMBLE DE DOCUMENTS | [2003/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.09.2013 | [2014/37] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0596511 (JUKI KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,9 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9901295 (BELL & HOWELL CO [DE], et al) [X] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE19913637 (BELL & HOWELL CO [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-11; | [A]US4169341 (OESCHGER FRANK A [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0539231 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0596511 |