EP1322444 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SPUTTER TARGETS WITH INTERNAL COOLING CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH SMD, INC. 3600 Gantz Road Grove City Ohio 43123 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states TOSOH SMD, INC. 3600 Gantz Road Grove City, Ohio 43123 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IVANOV, Eugene, Y. 3198 Windsor Place Grove City, OH 43123 / US | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End Kensington, London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01972989.6 | 11.09.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001US28411 | Priority number, date | US20000231917P | 11.09.2000 Original published format: US 231917 P | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0222300 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1322444 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/12, B23K31/02, B21K25/00, B23P11/00 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
H01J37/3497 (EP,US);
C23C14/35 (KR);
B21K25/00 (EP,US);
B23K20/02 (EP,US);
B23K20/023 (EP,US);
C23C14/3407 (EP,US);
H01J37/3435 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24298 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24744 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/27] | B23K20/12, B23K31/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SPUTTERTARGETS MIT INNEREN KÜHLKANÄLEN | [2003/27] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SPUTTER TARGETS WITH INTERNAL COOLING CHANNELS | [2003/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CIBLES POUR PULVERISATION CATHODIQUE DOTEES DE CANAUX DE REFROIDISSEMENT INTERNES | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 19.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/40] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2006 | 30.09.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5039913 (WEGMANN URS [CH], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,8,11,12,20,22-24 * column 3, lines 11-48; figure 2 * [A] 3,5,10,13; | [A]EP0800890 (TOUSUI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,7,8,11,12,20,22-24 * column 19, line 14 - column 20, line 33; figures 7-10 *; | [A]US5833823 (GRUENENFELDER PIUS [CH], et al) [A] 1-13,20,22-24* abstract *; | [Y]WO0015863 (TOSOH SMD INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,8,11,12,20,22-24 * page 3, lines 9-22 * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 1; figures 2-9 * | International search | [A]US6071389 (ZHANG HAO [US]); | [A]US4964564 (NEAL DONALD F [GB], et al); | [A]US5230459 (MUELLER JOHN J [US], et al); | [A]US5857611 (GILMAN PAUL S [US], et al); | [A]US5215639 (BOYS DONALD R [US]); | [A]US5595337 (DEMARAY RICHARD E [US], et al); | [A]US3849869 (BOCCALARI M); | [A]US4676843 (NAZMY MOHAMED Y [CH]); | [A]US5253796 (STACHER GEORGE W [US], et al); | [A]US5035314 (KORNYLAK ANDREW T [US]) |