29.08.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
29.04.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.12.2007 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
30.10.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.09.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
08.11.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
08.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
09.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] |
16.05.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
16.05.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] |
14.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|