Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6955852 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2005 | B2 | US2005092604 | 05.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0128411 | 11.09.2001 | US23191700 | 11.09.2000 | US34478203 | 13.02.2003 | US1354804 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6840427 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2005 | B2 | US2004056070 | 25.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0128411 | 11.09.2001 | US23191700 | 11.09.2000 | US34478203 | 13.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20030064398 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0128411 | 11.09.2001 | US23191700 | 11.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1322444 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2008 | A4 | EP1322444 | 02.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0128411 | 11.09.2001 | US23191700 | 11.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0222300 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2002 | A8 | WO0222300 | 21.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23191700 | 11.09.2000 |