EP1328206 - SYSTEMS FOR FOCUSED BIPOLAR TISSUE ABLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/30] | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR FOCUSED BIPOLAR TISSUE ABLATION | ||
[2008/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church / BB | [2008/38] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states Radiotherapeutics Corporation 1308 Borregas Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHL, Robert, S. 361 Tioga Court Palo Alto, CA 94036 / US | 02 /
GROSSER, Morton 1016 Lemon St. Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Alexander, L. 903 Arnold Way Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Wittestraße 30J 13509 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Straße 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/30] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01973032.4 | 14.09.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001US28707 | Priority number, date | US20000663048 | 15.09.2000 Original published format: US 663048 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0222032 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1328206 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1328206 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0016 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/143 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1432 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1467 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/30] | A61B18/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME FÜR DIE FOKUSSIERTE BIPOLARE GEWEBEABLATION | [2008/16] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR FOCUSED BIPOLAR TISSUE ABLATION | [2008/16] | French: | SYSTEMES D'ABLATION BIPOLAIRE FOCALISEE DE TISSUS | [2008/16] |
Former [2003/30] | METHODEN UND SYSTEME FÜR DIE FOKUSSIERTE BIPOLARE GEWEBEABLATION | ||
Former [2003/30] | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR FOCUSED BIPOLAR TISSUE ABLATION | ||
Former [2003/30] | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES D'ABLATION BIPOLAIRE FOCALISEE DE TISSUS | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE2124684 (STADELMANN W) [DX] 18* page 4, paragraph 4; figure 3 *; | [DA]US5827276 (LEVEEN ROBERT F [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * column 8, lines 42-62; figure 5 *; | [AX]WO9925260 (RITA MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 14, lines 13-15 * * page 15, lines 5-11; figure 9 * [X] 18 | International search | [Y]US5980517 (GOUGH EDWARD J [US]) | by applicant | US5827276 | US5855576 | US5868740 | DE2124684 | US6090105 | US6071280 | US5928229 | US5913855 | US5863290 | US5672174 | US5672173 | US5611803 | WO9932041 | WO9925260 | US6050992 | US6471695 |