EP1320850 - PALATOMETER AND NASOMETER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Logometrix Corporation 1725 East 250 South Springville, UT 84633 / US | [2003/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLETCHER, Samuel, G. 1725 East 250 South Springville, UT 84663 / US | 02 /
SPARKS, Burton 280 Mt. Olympus Drive NW Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | 03 /
TANNER, J., Matthew 2755 NW John Olsen Avenue Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01973262.7 | 19.09.2001 | [2003/26] | WO2001US29430 | Priority number, date | US20000233770P | 19.09.2000 Original published format: US 233770 P | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0225635 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1320850 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/00 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
A61B5/682 (EP,US);
A61B5/05 (EP,US);
A61B5/1126 (EP,US);
A61B5/6814 (EP,US);
A61B7/00 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PALATOMETER UND NASOMETER | [2003/26] | English: | PALATOMETER AND NASOMETER APPARATUS | [2003/26] | French: | PALATOMETRE ET NASOMETRE | [2003/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2002 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 01.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4112596 (FLETCHER SAMUEL G, et al); | [X]US4334542 (TAKINISHI KIYOTOSHI, et al); | [A]JPH01260481 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US5340316 (JAVKIN HECTOR R [US], et al) | by applicant | US3752929 | US4112596 |