EP1322720 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITION BASED ON POLYCHLOROPRENE DISPERSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUSCH, Rüdiger Altenberger-Dom-Str. 169 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
PANSKUS, Knut Grüner Weg 28A 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
SCHILDAN, Norbert Vincenzstr. 20 51065 Köln / DE | [2003/27] | Application number, filing date | 01974229.5 | 06.09.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001EP10275 | Priority number, date | DE2000146545 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10046545 | [2003/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0224825 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1322720 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1322720 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09J111/02, C08F36/18 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
C08F36/18 (EP,US);
C09J111/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08L2666/26 (EP,US);
C08L93/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2883 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F36/18, C08F2/26 (EP,US);
C09J111/02, C08L2666/26 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF BASIS VON POLYCHLOROPREN-DISPERSIONEN | [2003/27] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOSITION BASED ON POLYCHLOROPRENE DISPERSIONS | [2003/27] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ADHESIF A BASE DE DISPERSIONS DE POLYCHLOROPRENE | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 25.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Request for further processing for: | 21.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2006 | Decision despatched | 22.09.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.07.2007 | FI | 04.07.2007 | IE | 04.07.2007 | TR | 04.07.2007 | LU | 06.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | SE | 04.10.2007 | GR | 05.10.2007 | PT | 04.12.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 04.07.2007 | |
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
LU | 06.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 04.07.2007 | |
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
PT | 04.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0535460 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract ** page 3, line 9 - line 53 *; | [Y]WO9413703 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 4, line 3 - line 24 *; | [X]US5527846 (CHRISTELL LANCE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 50 - line 60 * |