EP1432590 - TRANSFER OF IMAGE WITH SUBLIMATING INKS AND MEDIUM IN SHEET FORM FOR PERFORMING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARADIGMA S.R.L. Vicolo San Domenico 10 37100 Verona / IT | [2004/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREVISAN, Tito Corso Porta Nuova, 109 I-37122 Verona / IT | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/27] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01974317.8 | 01.10.2001 | [2004/27] | WO2001EP11340 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03029018 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1432590 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1432590 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/34, B41M5/035 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
B41M5/035 (EP,US);
B41M5/345 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBLIMATIONSBILDÜBERTRAGUNG UND BLATTÄHNLICHES ÜBERTRAGUNGSMEDIUM | [2004/27] | English: | TRANSFER OF IMAGE WITH SUBLIMATING INKS AND MEDIUM IN SHEET FORM FOR PERFORMING IT | [2004/27] | French: | TRANSFERT D'IMAGE AVEC ENCRE DE SUBLIMATION ET SUPPORT EN FORME DE FEUILLE POUR L'EXECUTER | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2008 | BE | 13.02.2008 | CY | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | IT | 13.02.2008 | NL | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | IE | 01.10.2008 | LU | 01.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
LU | 01.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
LU | 01.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 24.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3530794 (RITZERFELD GERHARD) [A] 1-47* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0710508 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-47 * claim 1 * |