EP1358649 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MASKING PART OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ganci, Eric Rue Sourya 10,immeuble Radi, Appt. 23 Guéliz 40000 Marrakech / MA | For all designated states Zebina, Denis Auguste Avenue Yacoub El Mansour Résidence DRARGA 40 000 Marrakech / MA | [2006/03] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Ganci, Eric Rue Sourya 10,immeuble Radi, Appt. 23 Guéliz 40000 Marrakech / MA | ||
For all designated states Zebina, Denis Auguste Avenue Yacoub El Mansour Résidence DRARGA 40 000 Marrakech / MA | |||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Ganci, Eric Villa Courteline, 230, route de Trets 83640 Saint-Zacharie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Renaud-Goud, Thierry, et al GPI & Associés EuroParc de Pichaury Bât D1-1 étage 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cédex 3 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Renaud-Goud, Thierry, et al GPI & Associés EuroParc de Pichaury Bât D1-1 étage 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cédex 3 / FR | ||
Former [2003/45] | Renaud-Goud, Thierry Renaud-Goud Conseil, 5, rue de Montigny 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 01974425.9 | 03.10.2001 | [2003/45] | WO2001FR03044 | Priority number, date | FR20000012751 | 05.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0012751 | FR20010011145 | 27.08.2001 Original published format: FR 0111145 | [2003/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0229767 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1358649 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1358649 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/10 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
B05B12/24 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1052 (EP,US);
Y10T428/192 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MASKIERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGTEILS | [2003/45] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MASKING PART OF A VEHICLE | [2003/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MASQUAGE D'UNE PARTIE D'UN VEHICULE | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 12.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2006 | CY | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | GB | 18.01.2006 | IE | 18.01.2006 | IT | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | TR | 18.01.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | DE | 19.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | LU | 03.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
LU | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
DE | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 29.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2239040 (HOLMES MYRA J) [X] 1,2,9 * column 2, line 40 - line 64; figures 1,7-14 * * page 2, column 2, line 22 - page 3, column 1, line 23 * [A] 10; | [A]US2979840 (EASTMAN HOWARD W) [A] 1,5-7 * column 2, line 24 - line 56; figures 1,3 *; | [DX]US3752304 (ALEF P) [DX] 13,15,19,21,22,25 * column 2, line 6 - line 10; figures 9,10 *; | [XA]US4420520 (JONES WALLACE R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,28 * column 4, line 12 - line 44 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 41 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 25; figures 2-6 * [A] 8,12; | [A]US4572761 (PHILLIPS SR JAMES E [US]) [A] 26 * column 2, line 8 - line 23; figure 1 *; | [X]US4646364 (O'LAREY POLLY A [US]) [X] 13,15,21,25 * column 2, line 4 - line 26 * * column 2, line 59 - line 64; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE8709562U (RADMALL JOHN ERIK) [A] 1,29 * abstract *; | [XA]US4802692 (STRYD THOMAS N [US]) [X] 13,16-18,20,21,24,25 * column 2, line 13 - line 40 * * column 3, line 36 - line 60 * * column 4, line 18 - line 26; figure 2 * [A] 23; | [DA]EP0334360 (NAGOYA OILCHEMICAL [JP]) [DA] 13,21* column 4, line 28 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [XA]US5150726 (RUCKER JOIE [US]) [X] 1,9-11 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 34 * [A] 3; | [X]US5205454 (SCHUTZ RUDOLPH W [US], et al) [X] 13,15,21-23,25 * column 2, line 48 - line 64; figures 1,3 *; | [A]GB2265404 (COOPER BARRIE DAVID [AU]) [A] 29 * page 3, line 16 - line 23 *; | [X]US5562964 (JONES RICHARD E [US]) [X] 13,15,21,23,25 * column 3, line 34 - line 42; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5631055 (VINES DOUGLASS M [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * column 4, line 51 - line 56 * * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 18 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 2 *; | [A]US5649631 (LOFLIN GARY W [US]) [A] 26,27 * column 6, line 7 - line 11 * * column 6, line 27 - line 34; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5894923 (HAMSTRA RANDALL W [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,13-15,19 * column 2, line 40 - line 42; figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 5 - line 7 * | by applicant | US2371859 | US3752304 | EP0334360 |