EP1326606 - EP4 RECEPTOR INHIBITORS TO TREAT RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS INC. Mitsui Building, 1-1,Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0461 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS INC. Mitsui Building, 1-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0461 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUDOLY, L., c/o Pfizer Global Research & Devel. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 02 /
OKUMURA, T, c/o Pfizer Global Research and Devel. 2, Aza 5-gochi, Taketoyo-cho Chita-gun, Aichi-ken 470-2393 / JP | 03 /
SHIMOJO, M. 3-17-12-301 Tarumi - cho Sulta-shi, Osaka 564-0062 / JP | [2003/42] |
Former [2003/29] | 01 /
AUDOLY, L., c/o Pfizer Global Research & Devel. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | ||
02 /
OKUMURA, T, c/o Pfizer Global Research and Devel. 2, Aza 5-gochi, Taketoyo-cho Chita-gun, Aichi-ken 470-2393 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMOJO, M., c/o Pfizer Global Research and Devel. 2, Aza 5-gochi, Taketoyo-cho Chita-gun, Aichi-ken 470-2393 / JP | Representative(s) | Ruddock, Keith Stephen, et al Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Ruddock, Keith Stephen, et al Pfizer Limited, UK Patent Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01974609.8 | 15.10.2001 | [2003/29] | WO2001IB01942 | Priority number, date | US20000241825P | 19.10.2000 Original published format: US 241825 P | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0232422 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1326606 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4178, A61K31/437, A61P29/00, A61K31/64 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
C07D213/75 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (KR);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/64 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/04 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D235/06 (EP,US);
C07D235/08 (EP,US);
C07D235/12 (EP,US);
C07D235/14 (EP,US);
C07D235/16 (EP,US);
C07D235/18 (EP,US);
C07D235/30 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D473/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/29] | Extension states | AL | 14.04.2003 | LT | 14.04.2003 | LV | 14.04.2003 | MK | 14.04.2003 | RO | 14.04.2003 | SI | 14.04.2003 | Title | German: | EP4 REZEPTOR INHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RHEUMATISCHER ARTHRITIS | [2003/29] | English: | EP4 RECEPTOR INHIBITORS TO TREAT RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS | [2003/29] | French: | INHIBITEURS DU RECEPTEUR EP4 DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT DE LA POLYARTHRITE RHUMATOIDE | [2003/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/44] | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2330307 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9947497 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [A] 1,5* claims 1,19,21 *; | [X]WO0021542 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,5 *; | [X]WO0021532 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,5 * |