EP1328248 - ALCOHOL-FREE PERFUMING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states FIRMENICH SA 1, route des Jeunes Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STORA, Thierry 77, place de la Mairie F-01630 Sergy / FR | 02 /
DAUGERON, Aude 309 bis, route de l'Empereur F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | 03 /
MOUNIER, Rémy 17, allée des Fontigneux F-78126 Aulnay sur Mauldre / FR | 04 /
PERSONNIC, Nathalie Le Cocolet - Bât. A1, 2, rue du Vieux Château F-74100 Annemasse / FR | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Salvaterra-Garcia, Maria de Lurdes, et al Firmenich SA Département des Brevets Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Salvaterra-Garcia, Maria de Lurdes, Dr., et al Firmenich SA Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 01974619.7 | 17.10.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001IB01961 | Priority number, date | CH20000002060 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: CH 206000 | [2003/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0232390 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1328248 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/46 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALKOHOL-FREIE RIECHSTOFF-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2003/30] | English: | ALCOHOL-FREE PERFUMING COMPOSITION | [2003/30] | French: | COMPOSITION PARFUMANTE SANS ALCOOL | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 16.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/51] | 12.01.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.05.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/51] | Appeal following examination | 15.03.2010 | Appeal received No. T1358/10 | 12.05.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.07.2013 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2013/29] | 22.05.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 22.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.05.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP14169287.1 / EP2786736 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0571677 (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [A] 1-16 * Page 6, ligne 39-44; page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 41; example 3; claims 1-22 *; | [A]EP0572080 (QUEST INT [NL]) [A] 1-16 * Page 7, ligne 1-4; page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 55; example 3; claims 1-19 *; | [A]EP0516508 (SAINT LAURENT PARFUMS [FR]) [A] 1-16 * Colonne 2, ligne 53-57; colonne 4, ligne 12-20;; column 5, lines 10-16; claims 1-11 *; | [A]US5320863 (CHUNG SIEW L [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 11 - line 28; example II; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US5585343 (MCGEE THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * examples 2-4,8; claims 1-22 *; | [A]FR2703926 (SHISEIDO INTERNATIONAL FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-16 * example 1; claims 1-7 * |