EP1311165 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR COATING FOODSTUFFS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruitenberg Ingredients B.V. Griftstraat 8 7391 TM Twello / NL | [2005/48] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states W. Ruitenberg CZN. N.V. Utrechtseweg 106 3818 EP Amersfoort / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOORHUIS, Johannes, Gerardus, Maria Binnen de Veste 67 NL-3811 PG Amersfoort / NL | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/23] | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo, et al AOMB John F. Kennedylaan 2 P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2010/42] | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo, et al Zacco Netherlands B.V. Postbus 75683 1070 AR Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2003/21] | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 01974996.9 | 27.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001NL00628 | Priority number, date | NL20001016018 | 25.08.2000 Original published format: NL 1016018 | [2003/21] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0215715 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1311165 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1311165 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/0532, A23L1/0526, A23P1/12, A22C13/00, A23P1/08, A23L1/317 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
A22C13/0013 (EP,US);
A23L13/62 (EP,US);
A23L13/65 (EP,US);
A23L29/238 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23P20/105 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5026, A23V2250/506 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 14.02.2003 | SI | 14.02.2003 | Title | German: | ÜBERZUGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERZIEHEN VON NAHRUNGSMITTELN | [2003/21] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR COATING FOODSTUFFS | [2003/21] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT D'ALIMENTS | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2001 | Translation filed | 14.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 23.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2007
07.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE CARGILL, INCORPORATED 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391-5624 / US Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | 02
22.08.2007
16.01.2009
WITHDRAWN ISP INVESTMENTS LLC 818 Washington Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US Opponent's representative Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2007
07.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE CARGILL, INCORPORATED 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391-5624 / US Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
02
22.08.2007
16.01.2009
WITHDRAWN ISP INVESTMENTS LLC 818 Washington Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US Opponent's representative Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2007
07.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE CARGILL, INCORPORATED 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391-5624 / US Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
02
22.08.2007
16.01.2009
WITHDRAWN ISP INVESTMENTS LLC 818 Washington Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US Opponent's representative Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2007
07.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE CARGILL, INCORPORATED 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391-5624 / US Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
02
22.08.2007
16.01.2009
WITHDRAWN ISP INVESTMENTS LLC 818 Washington Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US Opponent's representative Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | |||
Former [2007/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2007
CARGILL, INCORPORATED 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391-5624 / US Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
02
22.08.2007
ISP INVESTMENTS LLC 818 Washington Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US Opponent's representative Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | 14.11.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.03.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.04.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/11] | Appeal following opposition | 10.11.2011 | Appeal received No. T2403/11 | 23.01.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.04.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 30.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 22.11.2006 | CY | 22.11.2006 | LI | 22.11.2006 | LU | 27.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2015/20] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 22.11.2006 | |
LU | 27.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | MC | 31.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2611708 (OWENS HARRY S, et al) [X] 1,2,4,9-12,18,19 * column 3, line 26 - line 75 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 7 * * column 6, line 57 - line 60 *; | [X]GB883976 (GEN FOODS CORP) [X] 1-4,9-14,18,19 * page 1, line 92 - page 4, line 4 * * example - *; | [X]GB1055373 (STALEY MFG CO A E, et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,18,19 * page 2, line 56 - line 85 * * page 3, line 23 - line 63 * * page 3, line 95 - page 4, line 4 *; | [X]GB1491997 (MERCK & CO INC) [X] 1-7,9-13,18 * example . *; | [X]GB1596294 (MARS LTD) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,13,18,19 * example 3 *; | [X]GB2149639 (ACHATES INVESTMENT CO) [X] 1-13,18,19 * page 1, line 98 - page 2, line 121 * * page 2, line 41 - line 54 * * example - *; | [X]EP0228319 (GEL DOR SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,5-12,18,19 * page 3, line 1 - line 27 * * page 4, line 30 - page 6, line 15 * * page 8, line 5 - line 23 *; | [X]FR2639193 (RACIONALIZACION MECANIZACION [ES]) [X] 1-7,9-13,15,16,18 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 18 *; | [X]US5096754 (HAMMER KLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,9-13,15,16,18,19 * column 3, line 1 - line 51 * * column 4, paragraph 2 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 17 *; | [X]NL9100711 (TNO) [X] 1-6,9-12,18,19 * column 5, line 2 - line 15 *; | [X]US5356654 (SPEIRS CHARLES [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,18,19 * column 3, paragraph 1 * * examples 1,3,8,10,13 *; | [XD]WO9955165 (GIST BROCADES BV [NL], et al) [XD] 1-4,9-19 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3 * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 27 * * examples 1,7,8,10 *; | [X]FR2785265 (GERVAIS DANONE CO [FR]) [X] 1-14,18,19 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 8, line 15 * * example 3 *; | [XP]WO0067582 (MACQUARRIE REG [CA], et al) [XP] 1-12,18,19 * page 4, line 6 - line 24 ** page 6, paragraph 3 * |