EP1309293 - INTRAVASCULAR STENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2005/51] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states SciMed Life Systems, Inc. One SciMed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311-1566 / US | ||
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | ||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Jang, G. David 30725 Eastbern Lane Redlands California 92374 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jang, G. David 30725 Eastburn Lane Redlands, CA 92374 / US | [2003/29] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/14] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/20] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01975287.2 | 21.09.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001US29562 | Priority number, date | US20000234614P | 22.09.2000 Original published format: US 234614 P | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0224112 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1309293 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1309293 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91525 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91533 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91558 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91583 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAVASCULÄRER STENT | [2003/20] | English: | INTRAVASCULAR STENT APPARATUS | [2003/20] | French: | STENT INTRAVASCULAIRE | [2003/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2002 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06010357.9 / EP1702588 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | TR | 23.08.2006 | LU | 21.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
TR | 23.08.2006 | ||
LU | 21.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9740780 (JANG G DAVID [US]) [A] 1,61 * page 7, line 12 - line 23 * * page 11, line 3 - line 16 ** figure 2A *; | [XA]US5733303 (ISRAEL HENRY MARSHALL [IL], et al) [X] 1,8-10,14,16-19,22,29,33,34,38-42,44,47,48,52,56,57 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 7 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 2-4,11-13,15,20,21,23,24,26-28,30-32,35-37,43,45,46,49,51,53-55,58-61; | [X]WO9820810 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1,8-10,16,17,33,38-41,47 * page 16, line 1 - page 17, line 15 * * figures 1,2A,2C *; | [PX]WO0062710 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,8-12,14-19,21,22,26,27,29,33-40,42,43,45,47-50,52,56-63,69-71,73-75,77,78,82,83,85,89-95,97,98,100,102-106,110-112 * page 12, line 5 - line 14 * * figure 6 *; | [EL]WO0224112 (JANG G DAVID [US]) [EL] 1-117 * the whole document * |