EP1351875 - DEVICE FOR RECEIVING PRINTED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferag AG Zürichstrasse 74 8340 Hinwil / CH | [2003/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEU, Willy Wallikerstrasse 29 CH-8330 Pfäffikon / CH | 02 /
MÜLLER, Erwin Kalchofenstrasse 25 CH-8635 Dürnten / CH | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 01975944.8 | 24.10.2001 | [2003/42] | WO2001CH00632 | Priority number, date | CH20010008301 | 19.01.2001 Original published format: CH 83012001 | [2003/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02057167 | Date: | 25.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1351875 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1351875 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H39/02 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
B65H39/02 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4356 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME VON DRUCKEREIPRODUKTEN | [2003/42] | English: | DEVICE FOR RECEIVING PRINTED PRODUCTS | [2003/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECEPTION DE PRODUITS D'IMPRIMERIE | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 22.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.05.2006 | FI | 10.05.2006 | FR | 10.05.2006 | IE | 10.05.2006 | IT | 10.05.2006 | NL | 10.05.2006 | TR | 10.05.2006 | SE | 10.08.2006 | GR | 11.08.2006 | ES | 21.08.2006 | PT | 10.10.2006 | AT | 24.10.2006 | LU | 24.10.2006 | BE | 31.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/01] | CY | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
FR | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
TR | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
AT | 24.10.2006 | ||
LU | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
TR | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
AT | 24.10.2006 | ||
LU | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
AT | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
AT | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 10.08.2006 | |
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 10.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0346578 (FERAG AG [CH]) [A] 1,13 * column 8, line 16 - column 9, line 22; figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP0354343 (FERAG AG [CH]) [A] 1,13 * column 3, line 8 - line 29 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 17; figures 1A,2 *; | [DA]EP0771754 (FERAG AG [CH]) [DA] 1,13 * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 53; figure 11 *; | [A]DE19638448 (GRAPHA HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1,13* abstract *; | [A]US5758871 (SCHLOUGH JAMES R [US]) [A] 1,13 * column W * |