EP1320449 - METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF MIXTURES OF SUBSTANCES AND REACTION MIXTURES AND A DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINBERGER, Michael Wiener Strasse 4 A-9220 Velden / AT | 02 /
MIKLAUTSCH, Josef 18. November Platz 2 A-9500 Villach / AT | [2003/26] | Application number, filing date | 01976089.1 | 16.08.2001 | [2003/26] | WO2001EP09454 | Priority number, date | DE2000148513 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10048513 | [2003/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0226459 | Date: | 04.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1320449 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1320449 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/60, B01F15/04, G05D11/13, C07C409/24 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
G05D11/132 (EP,US);
B01F23/49 (EP,US);
B01F35/2111 (EP,US);
B01F35/2211 (EP,US);
B01F35/883 (EP,US);
B29B7/325 (EP);
B29B7/603 (EP);
B29B7/72 (EP);
C07C407/00 (EP,US);
B01F25/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C407/00, C07C409/24 (US,EP);
C07C407/00, C07C409/26 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VON STOFF- UND REAKTIONSGEMISCHEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZU SEINER DURCHFÜHRUNG | [2003/26] | English: | METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF MIXTURES OF SUBSTANCES AND REACTION MIXTURES AND A DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2003/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CONTINUE DE MELANGES DE SUBSTANCES OU DE MELANGES REACTIONNELS ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | [2003/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 12.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | IE | 27.09.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | PT | 13.03.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/20] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 27.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3817658 (MURASE S) [X] 1-6,8-12 * figures 1,4 *; | [X]US4019653 (SCHERER WILLIAM C, et al) [X] 1-6,8-12 * see abstract;; figure 1 *; | [X]US4176672 (BORBERG HARTMUT [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-12 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0026874 (ELASTOGRAN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6,8-12* figure 1 *; | [XY]US4440314 (VETTER KURT [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12 * column 7, lines 19-30; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 29-66 * [Y] 7; | [Y]DE3638552 (BENCKISER GMBH JOH A [DE]) [Y] 7 * column 3, lines 3-20; figure 1 *; | [X]DE3800788 (POSSEHL SPEZIALBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-12 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0641777 (LAPORTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 7 * page 5, line 34; figure 2 * |