EP1317319 - MIXED CONDUCTING MEMBRANES FOR SYNGAS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2003/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DYER, Paul, Nigel DECEASED / US | 02 /
CAROLAN, Michael, Francis 1091 Treeline Drive Allentown, PA 18103 / US | 03 /
BUTT, Darryl, P. 8203 SW 16th Place Gainesville, FL 32607 / US | 04 /
VAN DOORN, Rene, Hendrik, Elias Dr.-Loeffelladstrasse 16 86609 Donauworth / DE | 05 /
CUTLER, Raymond, Ashton 1574 South 1175 East Bountiful, UT 84010 / US | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Westendorp Sommer Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/27] | Westendorp Sommer Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 860245 81629 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/24] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01976135.2 | 22.08.2001 | [2003/24] | WO2001EP09704 | Priority number, date | US20000643698 | 22.08.2000 Original published format: US 643698 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0216015 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317319 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1317319 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1317319 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/02, B01D53/22, B01J12/00, C01B3/34, C04B35/26 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
B01D71/024 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/2475 (EP,KR,US);
C01B13/0255 (EP,KR,US);
C01B3/382 (EP,KR,US);
C01B3/386 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/2641 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2323/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00103 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00157 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00159 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0238 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0261 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/041 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/043 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0495 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0811 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0822 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0833 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0866 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0883 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/1041 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1052 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/1064 (EP,US);
C01B2203/107 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/1241 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/1264 (EP,US);
C01B2203/127 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/142 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/146 (EP,US);
C01B2203/147 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/148 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2210/0046 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2210/0051 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2210/0071 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2210/0075 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/24] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTE LEITENDE MEMBRANEN FÜR DIE SYNTHESEGAS PRODUKTION | [2003/24] | English: | MIXED CONDUCTING MEMBRANES FOR SYNGAS PRODUCTION | [2003/24] | French: | MEMBRANES CONDUCTRICES MIXTES SERVANT A PRODUIRE DU GAZ DE SYNTHESE | [2003/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 17.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2005
29.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SURVEILLANCE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Conan, Philippe Claude L'Air Liquide SA Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2005
29.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SURVEILLANCE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Conan, Philippe Claude L'Air Liquide SA Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 26.04.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.10.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.11.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.02.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.08.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 18.01.2007 | Appeal received No. T0121/07 | 23.03.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.08.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 05.08.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.08.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2004 | BE | 16.06.2004 | CH | 16.06.2004 | CY | 16.06.2004 | FI | 16.06.2004 | LI | 16.06.2004 | TR | 16.06.2004 | LU | 22.08.2004 | IE | 23.08.2004 | MC | 31.08.2004 | GR | 16.09.2004 | SE | 16.09.2004 | PT | 16.11.2004 | DK | 31.08.2011 | [2013/36] |
Former [2013/23] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
CY | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
TR | 16.06.2004 | ||
LU | 22.08.2004 | ||
IE | 23.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
PT | 16.11.2004 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2008/03] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
CY | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
TR | 16.06.2004 | ||
LU | 22.08.2004 | ||
IE | 23.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
PT | 16.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
CY | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
TR | 16.06.2004 | ||
LU | 22.08.2004 | ||
IE | 23.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
TR | 16.06.2004 | ||
IE | 23.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
IE | 23.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
LI | 16.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9840160 (BORESKOVA INST KATALIZA SIBIR [RU], et al); | [XY]US5972296 (HARDTL KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al); | [YD]US6033632 (SCHWARTZ MICHAEL [US], et al); | by applicant | US5306411 | US5356728 | US5580497 | US6033632 | US6056807 | US6077323 | Opposition | US4863971 | US5306411 | US5693212 | US6060420 |