Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009106878 | ![]() | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7290108 | 28.02.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03086205 | ![]() | 04.03.2004 | A3 | WO03086205 | 23.10.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9968430 | ![]() | 15.05.2018 | B2 | US2015305845 | 29.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201514793743 | 08.07.2015 | US201113150026 | 01.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201414476484 | 03.09.2014 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9918817 | ![]() | 20.03.2018 | B2 | US2015272714 | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201414151873 | 10.01.2014 | US201213402978 | 23.02.2012 | US201514740276 | 16.06.2015 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US7290108 | 28.02.2008 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9113992 | ![]() | 25.08.2015 | B2 | US2015025302 | 22.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201113150026 | 01.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201414476484 | 03.09.2014 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9089394 | ![]() | 28.07.2015 | B2 | US2014128663 | 08.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201414151873 | 10.01.2014 | US201213402978 | 23.02.2012 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US7290108 | 28.02.2008 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014051917 | ![]() | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | US201313966840 | 14.08.2013 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US32402805 | 30.12.2005 | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | US201113158426 | 12.06.2011 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014039248 | ![]() | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US32402805 | 30.12.2005 | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US201313966832 | 14.08.2013 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | US201113158426 | 12.06.2011 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8821370 | ![]() | 02.09.2014 | B2 | US2014039247 | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201313966818 | 14.08.2013 | US201113149994 | 01.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9089396 | ![]() | 28.07.2015 | B2 | US2014039244 | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US32402805 | 30.12.2005 | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US201313966855 | 14.08.2013 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | US201113158426 | 12.06.2011 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8668635 | ![]() | 11.03.2014 | B2 | US2012149977 | 14.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201213402978 | 23.02.2012 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US7290108 | 28.02.2008 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8469877 | ![]() | 25.06.2013 | B2 | US2012143000 | 07.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113160338 | 14.06.2011 | US32402805 | 30.12.2005 | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | US201213360311 | 27.01.2012 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8574148 | ![]() | 05.11.2013 | B2 | US2011282136 | 17.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201113149994 | 01.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8932202 | ![]() | 13.01.2015 | B2 | US2011245594 | 06.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201113159425 | 14.06.2011 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8454492 | ![]() | 04.06.2013 | B2 | US2011238095 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201113150043 | 01.06.2011 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8182412 | ![]() | 22.05.2012 | B2 | US2011237879 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32402805 | 30.12.2005 | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | US201113163501 | 17.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8852075 | ![]() | 07.10.2014 | B2 | US2011237878 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US32402805 | 30.12.2005 | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | US201113158426 | 12.06.2011 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8888678 | ![]() | 18.11.2014 | B2 | US2011237877 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201113158424 | 12.06.2011 | US7290108 | 28.02.2008 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8911347 | ![]() | 16.12.2014 | B2 | US2011237876 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201113150026 | 01.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8920308 | ![]() | 30.12.2014 | B2 | US2011237875 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201113150015 | 01.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8273011 | ![]() | 25.09.2012 | B2 | US2011237874 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201113150010 | 01.06.2011 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8512223 | ![]() | 20.08.2013 | B2 | US2011237873 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201113150005 | 01.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8118728 | ![]() | 21.02.2012 | B2 | US2011237870 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201113165561 | 21.06.2011 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8123673 | ![]() | 28.02.2012 | B2 | US2011237869 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201113165525 | 21.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8182413 | ![]() | 22.05.2012 | B2 | US2011237868 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32402805 | 30.12.2005 | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | US201113163509 | 17.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8128554 | ![]() | 06.03.2012 | B2 | US2011237867 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113160338 | 14.06.2011 | US32402805 | 30.12.2005 | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8118727 | ![]() | 21.02.2012 | B2 | US2011237866 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201113160275 | 14.06.2011 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8801596 | ![]() | 12.08.2014 | B2 | US2011237865 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201113159422 | 14.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8449450 | ![]() | 28.05.2013 | B2 | US2011230709 | 22.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201113149982 | 01.06.2011 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8162818 | ![]() | 24.04.2012 | B2 | US2011230708 | 22.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201113149977 | 01.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8821369 | ![]() | 02.09.2014 | B2 | US2011230705 | 22.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201113149987 | 01.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8047983 | ![]() | 01.11.2011 | B2 | US2011178365 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201113079682 | 04.04.2011 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8007430 | ![]() | 30.08.2011 | B2 | US2010280308 | 04.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8167785 | ![]() | 01.05.2012 | B2 | US2008200751 | 21.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US7290108 | 28.02.2008 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006205995 | ![]() | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US32402805 | 30.12.2005 | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006058578 | ![]() | 16.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7789821 | ![]() | 07.09.2010 | B2 | US2006041185 | 23.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6960160 | ![]() | 01.11.2005 | B2 | US2003191360 | 09.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10639138 | ![]() | 05.05.2020 | B2 | US2018153672 | 07.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815883110 | 30.01.2018 | US201414151873 | 10.01.2014 | US201213402978 | 23.02.2012 | US201514740276 | 16.06.2015 | US7290108 | 28.02.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10449025 | ![]() | 22.10.2019 | B2 | US2018228589 | 16.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201514793743 | 08.07.2015 | US201113150026 | 01.06.2011 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | US201414476484 | 03.09.2014 | US201815949075 | 10.04.2018 | US83760110 | 16.07.2010 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10076394 | ![]() | 18.09.2018 | B2 | US2017042650 | 16.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39899203 | 11.04.2003 | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | US201514741466 | 17.06.2015 | US32402805 | 30.12.2005 | US51048805 | 28.03.2005 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US201313966855 | 14.08.2013 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | US201113158426 | 12.06.2011 | US19906105 | 08.08.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2257226 | ![]() | 19.09.2012 | B1 | EP2257226 | 08.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB50174 | 22.02.2009 | US7290108 | 28.02.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1492459 | ![]() | 05.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9571701 | ![]() | 22.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003229899 | ![]() | 27.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1324705 | ![]() | 30.08.2006 | B1 | EP1324705 | 09.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2427882 | 17.03.2009 | C | CA2427882 | 18.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2481275 | 25.10.2011 | C | CA2481275 | 23.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60122756T | 13.09.2007 | T2 | DE60122756D1 | 12.10.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2394751T | 05.02.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB50174 | 22.02.2009 | US7290108 | 28.02.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0208359D0 | 22.05.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2382993 | 16.03.2005 | B | GB2382993 | 18.06.2003 | A | GB0308389D0 | 21.05.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0104554 | 12.10.2001 | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2402343 | 15.03.2006 | B | GB2402343 | 08.12.2004 | A | GB0420768D0 | 20.10.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0208359 | 11.04.2002 | GB0301573 | 11.04.2003 | US39396902 | 05.07.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0230293 | ![]() | 18.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE337730T | 15.09.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2271077T | 16.04.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0025068D0 | 29.11.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0025068 | 12.10.2000 |