EP1371072 - MAGNETORESISTIVE SPIN-VALVE SENSOR AND READ HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hong, Jongill, c/o Ceramic Eng. Yonsei University Shinchon 134, Seodaemun Seoul 120-749 / KR | 02 /
Kanai, Hitoshi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Kane, Junichi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Noma, Kenji, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01976850.6 | 26.10.2001 | [2003/51] | WO2001JP09447 | Priority number, date | WO2001JP02261 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: PCT/JP01/02261 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02078021 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1371072 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01F10/32, G11B5/39, H01L43/10 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G01R33/09 (KR);
G01R33/093 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B5/39 (EP,US);
G11B5/3903 (EP,US);
H01F10/324 (EP,US);
G11B2005/3996 (EP,US);
H01F41/325 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Title | German: | MAGNETORESISTIVES SPINVENTIL-SENSOR UND LESEKOPF | [2003/51] | English: | MAGNETORESISTIVE SPIN-VALVE SENSOR AND READ HEAD | [2003/51] | French: | TETE DE LECTURE ET CAPTEUR MAGNETORESISTIF MOBILE A DIODE A LASER | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 10.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/46] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6181534 (GILL HARDAYAL SINGH [US]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * column 5, line 55 - line 65 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 13; figures 9,17,18; claims 1,13 *; | [A] - HONG J ET AL, "EFFECT OF THIN OXIDE CAPPING ON INTERLAYER COUPLING IN SPIN VALVES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200009), vol. 36, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 2629 - 2631, XP001019926 [A] 1-3 * page 2629, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.908539 |