EP1330715 - STORING DEVICE, STORING CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTAKE, Toshihiko 5-12, Misaku-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0095 / JP | 02 /
SEKIBE, Tsutomu 5-49-34, Yamanoue Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0047 / JP | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01976857.1 | 26.10.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001JP09459 | Priority number, date | JP20000326472 | 26.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000326472 | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0235548 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1330715 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1330715 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G11C16/00 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
G11C8/12 (EP,US);
G11C16/16 (EP,US);
G11C2216/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/31] | Title | German: | SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERSTEUERVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2003/31] | English: | STORING DEVICE, STORING CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM | [2003/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE, PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE STOCKAGE ET PROGRAMME | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 05.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000122917 ; | [DA]JP2000132982 ; | [A]US5572466 (SUKEGAWA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,6,8-10* column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 65 *; | [A]US5603001 (SUKEGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6-10 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 61 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000122917 A 20000428 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,6,8-10 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000132982 A 20000512 (SONY CORP) [DA] 1,6,8-10 * abstract * |