EP1354410 - DIGITAL TO ANALOG CONVERTER EMPLOYING SIGMA-DELTA LOOP AND FEEDBACK DAC MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teradyne, Inc. 321 Harrison Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states TERADYNE, INC. 321 Harrison Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEEN, Timothy, W. 160 Foster Street Brighton, MA 02135 / US | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01977178.1 | 26.09.2001 | [2003/43] | WO2001US30056 | Priority number, date | US20000676064 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: US 676064 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0227944 | Date: | 04.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1354410 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1354410 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03M3/04 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
H03M3/322 (EP,US);
H03M1/66 (KR);
H03M3/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIGITAL-ANALOG-WANDLER MIT SIGMA-DELTA SCHLEIFE UND RÜCKKOPPLUNGS-DAW-MODEL | [2003/43] | English: | DIGITAL TO ANALOG CONVERTER EMPLOYING SIGMA-DELTA LOOP AND FEEDBACK DAC MODEL | [2003/43] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR NUMERIQUE-ANALOGIQUE UTILISANT UNE BOUCLE SIGMA-DELTA ET UN MODELE DE CAN A RETROACTION | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.04.2007 | CH | 11.04.2007 | CY | 11.04.2007 | DK | 11.04.2007 | FI | 11.04.2007 | LI | 11.04.2007 | TR | 11.04.2007 | SE | 11.07.2007 | GR | 12.07.2007 | ES | 22.07.2007 | PT | 11.09.2007 | GB | 26.09.2007 | LU | 26.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
CY | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
GB | 26.09.2007 | ||
LU | 26.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
CY | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
GB | 26.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
GB | 26.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 11.04.2007 | |
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 22.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4829236 (BRENARDI ARA [US], et al) [Y] 9,10,19,20 * column 3, line 17 - line 28 *; | [XY]US4977403 (LARSON LAWRENCE E [US]) [X] 1-5,12-17,22-26 * figure 5 * [Y] 6-11,18-21; | [Y]EP0457496 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-8,18 * figure 3 *; | [XY]US5101205 (YASUDA AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1-6,12-17,22-26 * column 9, line 54 - line 68; figure 13 * [Y] 7-11,18-21; | [XY]US5406283 (LEUNG BOSCO [CA]) [X] 1-6,15-17,22-26 * figure 3 * [Y] 7-11,18-21; | [Y]US5815102 (MELANSON JOHN LAURENCE [US]) [Y] 11,21 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0889599 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 11,21 * figure 1 *; | [X] - CATALTEPE T ET AL, "Digitally corrected multi-bit Sigma Delta data converters", IEEE, (19890508), pages 647 - 650, XP010084892 [X] 1-4,6,9,10,15-19 * figure 2 * | [Y] - SCHREIER R ET AL, "Noise-shaped multbit D/A convertor employing unit elements", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19950928), vol. 31, no. 20, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1712 - 1713, XP006003450 [Y] 7,8,18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19951194 | [Y] - COLEMAN J O ET AL, "Vector switching generalizes D/A noise shaping", IEEE JOURNAL, (19990808), vol. 1, pages 478 - 480, XP010510672 [Y] 6-8,18 * figure 2 * | [Y] - CARLEY L R, "A NOISE-SHAPING CODER TOPOLOGY FOR 15+ BIT CONVERTERS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19890401), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 267 - 273, XP000111586 [Y] 6-8,18 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.18585 |