EP1339955 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR SCR APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 101 Wood Avenue, P.O. Box 770 Iselin, NJ 08830-0770 / US | For all designated states TNO Automotive P.O. Box 6033 2600 Delft / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 101 Wood Avenue, P.O. Box 770 Iselin, NJ 08830-0770 / US | ||
For all designated states TNO Automotive P.O. Box 6033 2600 Delft / NL | |||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Engelhard Corporation 101 Wood Avenue, P.O. Box 770 Iselin, NJ 08830-0770 / US | ||
For all designated states TNO Automotive P.O. Box 6033 2600 Delft / NL | |||
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states TNO Automotive P.O. Box 6033 2600 Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATCHETT, Joseph, A. 46 Queen Anne Drive Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 02 /
VERBEEK, Rudolfus, Petrus Gerbrandystraat 67 NL-2672 BK Naaldwijk / NL | 03 /
GRIMSTON, Karl, Richard 9 Strensham Court Mews Upper Strensham, Worc. WR8 9LR / US | 04 /
RICE, Gary, Wayne 1221 Raritan Road Scott Plains, NJ 07076 / US | 05 /
CALABRESE, John, Lawrence 112 Orchard Street Summit, NJ 07901 / US | 06 /
VAN GENDEREN, Mathijs Lepelaarstraat 73 NL-2623 JM Delft / NL | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01977743.2 | 15.10.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001US32029 | Priority number, date | US20000688663 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: US 688663 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0233232 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1339955 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1339955 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, B01D53/94 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
F01N3/208 (EP,US);
F01N3/20 (KR);
B01D53/90 (EP,US);
B01D53/9431 (EP,US);
B01D53/9495 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N3/103 (EP,US);
F01N9/005 (EP,US);
F01N2570/18 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/08 (EP,US);
F01N2610/12 (EP,US);
F01N2900/0404 (EP,US);
F01N2900/14 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1402 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1622 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1808 (EP,US);
F01N5/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR SCR-ANWENDUNGEN | [2003/36] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM FOR SCR APPLICATIONS | [2003/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR SYSTEMES MOBILES DE REDUCTION CATALYTIQUE SELECTIVE (SCR) DE NOX | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 10.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.08.2005 | ES | 31.08.2005 | FI | 31.08.2005 | TR | 31.08.2005 | CY | 15.10.2005 | IE | 17.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | DK | 30.11.2005 | GR | 30.11.2005 | PT | 23.02.2006 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/10] | BE | 31.08.2005 | |
ES | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
TR | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | BE | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
TR | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | BE | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | BE | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | BE | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 31.08.2005 | |
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 31.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4473536 (CARBERG WILLIAM G [US], et al) [DA] 1,40,46 * column 8, line 49 - column 11, line 49; figure -; claims 1,2 *; | [DA]US5606855 (TOMISAWA NAOKI [JP]) [DA] 30 * abstract *; | [DA]US5628186 (SCHMELZ HELMUT [DE]) [DA] 1,40,46 * abstract *; | [A]EP1024254 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,40,46 * abstract *; | [A]US6119448 (ZUTHER FRANK [DE], et al) | by applicant | US4188364 | US4303473 | US4314345 | US4403473 | US4473536 | US4751054 | US4963332 | US5047220 | US5490064 | US5522218 | US5606855 | US5628186 | US5643536 | US5785937 | US5833932 | US5842341 | US5845487 | - Journal of Air & Waste Management Association, B. GULLET, P GROFF, M. LINDA LIN AND J. M. CHEN, (19941001), pages 1188 - 1194 |