EP1451669 - Method and system for controlling thermal cycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/36] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING POWER CONSUMPTION | ||
[2011/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle America, Inc. 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2011/10] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 4150 Network Circle, MS SCA121-203 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIROV, Russell, N. 5400 Deidara Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 02 /
CEKLEOV, Michel 237 Sierra Vista Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
YOUNG, Mark, S. 2343 Perich Court Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 04 /
BALDWIN, William, M. 1247 Hickerson Court San Jose, CA 95127 / US | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2004/36] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01977822.4 | 26.09.2001 | [2004/36] | WO2001US42320 | Priority number, date | US20000670419 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: US 670419 | US20000670143 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: US 670143 | US20000669825 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: US 669825 | US20000669357 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: US 669357 | US20000670368 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: US 670368 | US20000670418 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: US 670418 | US20000670420 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: US 670420 | US20000670417 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: US 670417 | US20000670041 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: US 670041 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0227451 | Date: | 04.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1451669 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451669 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G06F1/324 (EP);
G06F1/08 (EP);
G06F1/206 (EP);
G06F1/3203 (EP);
Y02D10/00 (EP);
Y02D30/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Steuerung Temperaturzyklen | [2011/05] | English: | Method and system for controlling thermal cycles | [2011/05] | French: | Procédé et système pour contrôler des cycles thermiques | [2011/05] |
Former [2004/36] | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER LEISTUNGSAUFNAHME | ||
Former [2004/36] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING POWER CONSUMPTION | ||
Former [2004/36] | PROC D ET APPAREIL POUR R DUIRE LA CONSOMMATION LECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 03.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.06.2011 | BE | 29.06.2011 | CY | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | IT | 29.06.2011 | NL | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | IE | 26.09.2011 | LU | 26.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | ES | 10.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5740087 (SMENTEK DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 14 *; | [A]US5961613 (DENICOLA RICHARD M [US]) [A] * column 1, line 21 - line 63 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 12 *; | [A]US6088806 (CHEE LAWRENCE [CA]) [A] 12,13 * column 2, line 57 - column 6, line 3; figures 2-6 *; | [A]US6118306 (ORTON JOHN T [US], et al) [A] 12,13 * column 1, line 11 - line 49 * * column 2, line 2 - column 3, line 60 ** column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 55; figures 1-4 * |