EP1348101 - AUTONOMOUS WEAPON SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRO OPTIC SYSTEMS PTY. LIMITED 55A Monaro Street Queanbeyan, NSW 2620 / AU | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENE, Ben, A 15 Kaeppel Place Isaacs, Australi an Capital Territory / AU | 02 /
GREENE, Steven 15 Kaeppel Place Isaacs, Australi an Capital Territory / AU | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2003/40] | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01977996.6 | 17.10.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001AU01344 | Priority number, date | AU2000PR00804 | 17.10.2000 Original published format: AU PR080400 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0233342 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1348101 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F41G3/22, F41G3/06, G06F17/10, F41G3/16, F41G3/12 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
F41G3/12 (EP,US);
F41A23/24 (EP);
F41G3/06 (EP,US);
F41G3/165 (EP,US);
F41G3/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/40] | F41G3/22, F41G3/06, G06F17/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTONOMES WAFFENSYSTEM | [2003/40] | English: | AUTONOMOUS WEAPON SYSTEM | [2003/40] | French: | SYSTEME D'ARME AUTONOME | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 16.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | 16.06.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.06.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   16.06.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2010 | 31.10.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3912672 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 33; figures 1-7 * [A] 2-16; | [XA]DE19752464 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 38 - column 8, line 6; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-16; | [AD]US5949015 (SMITH STEVE [US], et al) | International search | [X]US3974740 (BILLOTTET HENRI, et al); | [X]US4579035 (WHITING IAN G [NL]); | [X]AU631349B ; | [X]US5682006 (PERRY JOHN STEPHEN [US], et al); | [X]US5992288 (BARNES GREGORY R [US]) | Examination | GB2103341 | GB2165714 | US5153366 |