EP1238499 - NETWORK INTERFACE DRIVER AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELPIGNANO, Diego Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SIORPAES, David Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01978380.2 | 18.09.2001 | [2002/37] | WO2001EP10871 | Priority number, date | EP20000203360 | 28.09.2000 Original published format: EP 00203360 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0228032 | Date: | 04.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1238499 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
H04L47/193 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/27 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/283 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W8/04 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | NETZWERKSCHNITTSTELLENTREIBER UND -VERFAHREN | [2002/37] | English: | NETWORK INTERFACE DRIVER AND METHOD | [2002/37] | French: | PILOTE D'INTERFACE DE RESEAU ET PROCEDE | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY] - BAKSHI B S ET AL, "Improving performance of TCP over wireless networks", DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS, 1997., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 17TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BALTIMORE, MD, USA 27-30 MAY 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970527), ISBN 0-8186-7813-5, pages 365 - 373, XP010229371 [X] 1,3,4,11,15,21 * figures 1,5 * * page 367, column L, line 49 - page 367, column R, line 8 * * page 369, column R, line 17 - page 371, column L, line 16 * [Y] 2,5,12,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.1997.598070 | [YA] - BALAKRISHNAN H ET AL, "IMPROVING TCP/IP PERFORMANCE OVER WIRELESS NETWORKS", MOBICOM. PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING, XX, XX, (199511), page COMPLETE, XP002920962 [Y] 2,5,12,16 * the whole document * [A] 6-10,13,14,17-20 |