EP1336311 - METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING CUSTOMIZED DATA FOR MOBILE TELEPHONE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swap Com 50 Rue de Marseille 69007 Lyon / FR | [2003/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEGURA, Fabrice 12 Rue Grandclément F-69330 MEYZIEU / FR | 02 /
MOKHTARI, Djellali 37 Rue Pierre Nicole, Bat B F-75005 PARIS / FR | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01978556.7 | 17.10.2001 | [2003/34] | WO2001FR03218 | Priority number, date | FR20000013423 | 18.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0013423 | [2003/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0233993 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1336311 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
H04W12/037 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,US);
H04W76/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON PERSONALISIERTEN INFORMATIONEN IN EINEM MOBILEN TELEFONNETZ | [2003/34] | English: | METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING CUSTOMIZED DATA FOR MOBILE TELEPHONE NETWORK | [2003/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE DIFFUSION D'INFORMATIONS PERSONNALISEES POUR RESEAU DE TELEPHONIE MOBILE | [2003/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 05.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/03] | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2327567 (ORANGE PERSONAL COMM SERV LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 10 - line 17 * * page 8, line 20 - page 15, line 7 * |