EP1332125 - PREPARATION OF 4-METHYL-2,3,5,6-TETRAFLUOROBENZYL ALCOHOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Limited European Regional Centre Priestley Road Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7YH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Syngenta Limited European Regional Centre Priestley Road Surrey Research Park Guildford Surrey GU2 7YH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Raymond Vincent Heavon Grangemouth Manufacturing Centre, Earls Road Grangemouth, Stirlingshire FK3 8XG / GB | 02 /
BROWN, Stephen Martin, c/o Process Technology Dept Leeds Road, Huddersfield West Yorkshire HD2 1FF / GB | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Waterman, John Richard, et al Syngenta Limited - IP Department Jealott's Hill International Research Centre P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB | [2008/32] |
Former [2003/32] | Waterman, John Richard, et al Syngenta Limited Intellectual Property Department Jealott's Hill International Research Centre, P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 01978595.5 | 18.10.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001GB04692 | Priority number, date | GB20000026348 | 27.10.2000 Original published format: GB 0026348 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0234707 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332125 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332125 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/48, C07C211/29, C07C29/09, C07C33/46, C07C67/14, C07C69/743 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
C07C209/48 (EP,US);
C07C29/09 (EP,KR,US);
C07C211/29 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/09, C07C33/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON 4-METHYL-2,3,5,6-TETRAFLUORBENZYLALKOHOL | [2003/32] | English: | PREPARATION OF 4-METHYL-2,3,5,6-TETRAFLUOROBENZYL ALCOHOL | [2003/32] | French: | PREPARATION D'ALCOOL DE 4-METHYL-2,3,5,6-TETRAFLUOROBENZYLE | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 22.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2004 | BE | 29.09.2004 | CY | 29.09.2004 | FI | 29.09.2004 | IT | 29.09.2004 | NL | 29.09.2004 | TR | 29.09.2004 | IE | 18.10.2004 | LU | 18.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.12.2004 | ES | 09.01.2005 | PT | 28.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/37] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CY | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IT | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 18.10.2004 | ||
LU | 18.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CY | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 18.10.2004 | ||
LU | 18.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 18.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 18.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 29.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0031199 (ICI PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,3 * page 35, line 5 - line 12 * * page 50, line 1 - line 13 *; | [A]GB2123823 (ICI PLC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2123824 (ICI PLC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2127013 (ICI PLC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3714602 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * example 2 *; | [A] - W.C. GROUTAS, ET AL., "Inactivation of leukocyte elastase by aryl azolides and sulphonate salts. Structure-activity relationship studies", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (198607), vol. 29, no. 7, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1302 - 1303, XP002187940 [A] 1 * scheme I, step A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00157a034 | [A] - J.M. BIRCHALL, ET AL., "Polyfluoroarenes. Part IV. 2,3,4,5,6-Pentafluorotoluene and related compounds", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Royal Society of Chemistry, Letchworth, GB, (196109), no. 9, pages 3719 - 3727, XP002187941 [A] 1 * page 3727 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/jr9610003719 |