EP1402713 - TELEPHONE OUTLET WITH PACKET TELEPHONY ADAPTER, AND A NETWORK USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mosaid Technologies Incorporated 11 Hines Road, Suite 203 Ottawa, ON K2K 2X1 / CA | [2009/34] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Serconet Ltd. 16 Ha'Haroshet Street, P.O. Box 2009 43657 Raanana / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BINDER, Yehuda 30 Yeshurun St. 45200 Hod HaSharon / IL | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01978798.5 | 15.10.2001 | [2004/14] | WO2001IL00954 | Priority number, date | IL20010144158 | 05.07.2001 Original published format: IL 14415801 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03005691 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1402713 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1402713 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H01R13/639 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04M11/00 (KR);
H04M7/0081 (US);
H04M1/2535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELEFONANSCHLUSS MIT PAKETTELEPHONIEADAPTER UND EIN NETZ WELCHES DEN TELEFONANSCHLUSS VERWENDET | [2010/49] | English: | TELEPHONE OUTLET WITH PACKET TELEPHONY ADAPTER, AND A NETWORK USING SAME | [2004/14] | French: | PRISE DE TELEPHONE A ADAPTATEUR DE TELEPHONIE NUMERIQUE, ET RESEAU UTILISANT CETTE PRISE | [2004/14] |
Former [2004/14] | TELEFONANSCHLUSS MIT PAKETTELEPHONIEADAPTER UND EIN NETZ WELCHE DERSELBIGE VERWENDET | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 06.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10162261.1 / EP2222071 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.06.2011 | BE | 29.06.2011 | CY | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | IT | 29.06.2011 | NL | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | ES | 10.10.2011 | IE | 15.10.2011 | LU | 15.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 15.10.2011 | ||
LU | 15.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 15.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IE | 15.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5737475 (REGESTER WILLIAM D [US]) [A] 1,12,23* column 1, line 26 - column 3, line 22 *; | [A]WO0128215 (PHONEX BROADBAND CORP [US]) [A] 1,12,23 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 15 * * page 6, line 21 - page 8, line 12 * | by applicant | US5530894 | EP0824298 | US6130893 | GB2352360 |