EP1247675 - WING OPENING AND CLOSING DEVICE FOR TRUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Giken Kabushiki Kaisha 15-3, Himonya 4-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-0003 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Seiko Giken Kabushiki Kaisha 15-3, Himonya 4-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo 152-0003 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIMOTO, Katsumi, /o SEIKO GIKEN K.K. 15-3, Himonya 4-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-0003 / JP | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Harry, et al RPK Patentanwälte Reinhardt, Pohlmann und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB Grünstrasse 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Reinhardt, Harry, et al Reinhardt & Pohlmann Partnerschaft, Grünstrasse 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01978870.2 | 24.10.2001 | [2002/41] | WO2001JP09319 | Priority number, date | JP20000324867 | 25.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000324867 | [2002/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0234559 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1247675 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/08, B62D33/04, B60J5/04 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
B60J5/0498 (EP,US);
B60J7/08 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2002/41] | B60J7/08, B62D33/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÖFFNUNGS-UND VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR LASTWAGENFLÜGEL | [2002/41] | English: | WING OPENING AND CLOSING DEVICE FOR TRUCK | [2002/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE ET DE FERMETURE D'AILES POUR CAMION | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2002 | Translation filed | 29.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 11.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/25] | 17.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.07.2003 | M02   Fee paid on   23.08.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09323546 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09323546 A 19971216 (SEIKO GIKEN KK) [X] 1,4 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2000006665 (SHINWA JIDOSHA KOGYO KK, et al); | [Y]JP2000006664 (SHINWA JIDOSHA KOGYO KK, et al); | [A]JPH08332849 (NHK SPRING CO LTD); | [A]JPH0867148 (NHK SPRING CO LTD); | [A]JP2000052776 (NIPPON TOREKUSU KK) |