EP1342031 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING CRYOGENIC LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chart Inc. 3505 County Road 42 West Burnsville, MN 55306 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Chart Inc. 3505 County Road 42 West Burnsville, MN 55306-3803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMMER, Claus 5335 Starview Lane Prior Lake, MN 55372-9604 / US | 02 /
DRUBE, Thomas, Karl 16785 Hershey Court Lakeville, MN 55044 / US | 03 /
GUSTAFSON, Keith Interstate 575 & Airport Drive Exit, P.O. Box 1312 Canton, GA 30114 / US | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Dauncey, Mark Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Dauncey, Mark Peter, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2003/37] | Every, David Aidan, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 01980000.2 | 12.10.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001US42649 | Priority number, date | US20000687767 | 13.10.2000 Original published format: US 687767 | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0231403 | Date: | 18.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1342031 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F17C7/02, F17C13/02, F17C5/00, F17C5/02, F17C6/00, F17C9/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
F17C5/007 (EP,US);
F17C13/025 (EP,US);
F17C13/026 (EP,US);
F17C5/02 (EP,US);
F17C6/00 (EP,US);
F17C7/04 (EP,US);
F17C9/00 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,US);
F17C2201/054 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0629 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0149 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0326 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0335 (EP,US);
F17C2221/011 (EP,US);
F17C2221/014 (EP,US);
F17C2221/016 (EP,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0135 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0304 (EP,US);
F17C2250/01 (EP,US);
F17C2250/032 (EP,US);
F17C2250/034 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0426 (EP,US);
F17C2250/043 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0439 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0621 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0631 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0694 (EP,US);
F17C2265/065 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/37] | F17C7/02, F17C13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE VON KRYOGENEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2003/37] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING CRYOGENIC LIQUIDS | [2003/37] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT LA DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDES CRYOGENIQUES | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.06.2008 | 16.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3633372 (KIMMEL CLEVE C, et al) [X] 27 * the whole document *; | [X]US3946572 (BRAGG KENNETH R) [X] 1-11,27-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5687776 (FORGASH DAVID JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US5787940 (BONN JOHN W [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5916246 (VIEGAS HERMAN H [US], et al); | [A]US5954101 (DRUBE PAUL ARNOLD [US], et al) |