EP1330411 - THERMOELASTIC ACTUATOR DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCAVOY, G. J., c/o Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | 02 /
SILVERBROOK, K., c/o Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 01980048.1 | 19.10.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001AU01332 | Priority number, date | US20000693079 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: US 693079 | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0232806 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1330411 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B81C1/00, B81B7/02, B41J2/045, H02N10/00, H01H1/00 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B81C99/006 (EP,US);
B81B7/00 (KR);
B41J2/14427 (EP,US);
B81B3/0024 (EP,US);
B81B3/0035 (EP,US);
F03G7/06 (EP,US);
H01H1/0036 (EP,US);
B81B2201/038 (EP,US);
F05C2203/0813 (EP,US);
F05C2203/083 (EP,US);
F05C2251/04 (EP,US);
F05C2251/044 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/31] | B81C1/00, B81B7/02, B41J2/045, H02N10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOELASTISCHE AKTORSTRUKTUR | [2003/31] | English: | THERMOELASTIC ACTUATOR DESIGN | [2003/31] | French: | MOD LE D'ACTIONNEUR THERMO LASTIQUE | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 20.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 28.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [X]WO9903681 (SILVERBROOK RES PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO0023279 (SILVERBROOK RESEARCH PTY LIMIT [AU], et al); | [X]WO0055089 (SILVERBROOK RES PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [XP]WO0064805 (SILVERBROOK RES PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [XP]US2001008406 (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU]) |