EP1368729 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR POWER MANAGEMENT IN A JAVA ACCELERATOR ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENVOY, David Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GOFF, Lonnie Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SEXTON, Bonnie Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street, Redhill Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/50] | Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01980250.3 | 17.08.2001 | [2003/50] | WO2001EP09509 | Priority number, date | US20000645468 | 23.08.2000 Original published format: US 645468 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0217064 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1368729 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1368729 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
G06F9/3879 (EP,US);
G06F9/00 (KR);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNG IN EINER JAVA BESCHLEUNIGER-UMGEBUNG | [2003/50] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR POWER MANAGEMENT IN A JAVA ACCELERATOR ENVIRONMENT | [2003/50] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GESTION D'ENERGIE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT D'ACCELERATEUR JAVA | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 16.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.2011 | BE | 12.10.2011 | CY | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | IT | 12.10.2011 | NL | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | TR | 12.10.2011 | GR | 13.01.2012 | ES | 23.01.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 12.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5392437 (MATTER EUGENE P [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5530932 (CARMEAN DOUGLAS M [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5787297 (LIN CHONG MING [US]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5953741 (EVOY DAVID ROSS [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,8-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5996083 (GUPTA RAJIV [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0002118 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,8-11 * abstract *; | [A] - LORCH J R ET AL, "SOFTWARE STRATEGIES FOR PORTABLE COMPUTER ENERGY MANAGEMENT", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, US, (19980601), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 60 - 73, XP000765376 [A] 1-3,8-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/98.683740 | Examination | US4171539 | US4203153 | US6789207 | - WONG W, "JAVA PROCESSORS, COPROCESSOR PERFORM DIRECT BYTECODE EXECUTION", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, PENTON MEDIA, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (20000724), vol. 48, no. 15, pages 25 - 26, XP001104342 | by applicant | US19960006704 | US19790005656 |