Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1240048 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2005 | B1 | EP1240048 | 18.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10052092 | 20.10.2000 | EP0112000 | 17.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0107338 | 27.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10052092 | 20.10.2000 | EP0112000 | 17.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50107359D1 | 13.10.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10052092 | 20.10.2000 | EP0112000 | 17.10.2001 | DE50107359 | 17.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6540297 | 01.04.2003 | B2 | US2003015904 | 23.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10052092 | 20.10.2000 | EP0112000 | 17.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0234564 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10052092 | 20.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10052092 | 30.09.2004 | B4 | DE10052092 | 02.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10052092 | 20.10.2000 |