03.06.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
25.06.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
17.05.2010 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
17.05.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.04.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
12.02.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.11.2009 |
First examination report |
|
04.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.05.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.04.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] |
26.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
23.12.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
23.12.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
30.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.06.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
13.06.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
14.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|