EP1330918 - READER FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION SENSING ELEMENT, SENSOR AND CORRESPONDING READING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 29-33, rue de la Fédération BP 510 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANTIGNY, Philippe 31 rue de la Balmette F-38640 CLAIX / FR | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Simonnet, Christine, et al Cabinet BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Simonnet, Christine, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/31] | Simonnet, Christine, et al c/o Brevatome, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01980623.1 | 22.10.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001FR03274 | Priority number, date | FR20000013543 | 23.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0013543 | [2003/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0235828 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1330918 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1330918 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
H04N25/59 (EP,US);
H04N25/77 (EP,US);
H04N25/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LESEVORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE STRAHLUNGEN, SENSOR, UND ENTSPRECHENDES LESEVERFAHREN | [2003/31] | English: | READER FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION SENSING ELEMENT, SENSOR AND CORRESPONDING READING METHOD | [2003/31] | French: | LECTEUR POUR ELEMENT DE DETECTION DE RAYONNEMENTS ELECTROMAGNETIQUES, CAPTEUR, ET PROCEDE DE LECTURE CORRESPONDANT | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 04.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |