EP1345726 - APPARATUS FOR MULTI-BEAM LASER MACHINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/39] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MULTI-BEAM LASER MACHINING | ||
[2009/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pixer Technology Ltd 44 Ma'ale Camon St. 21613 Carmiel / IL | [2008/25] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states UCLT Ltd. 44 Ma'ale Camon St. 21613 Carmiel / IL | ||
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states U.C. Laser Ltd. P.O. Box 351, Industrial Zone 21613 Carmiel / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHEMKOV, Sergei, V. Apt. 29, 14 Shakhmatov str. St.Petersburg, 198904 / RU | 02 /
DMITRIEV, Vladimir, Yu. apt. 227, 32 Kazakov str. St.Petersburg, 198332 / RU | 03 /
GULETSKY, Nicolai, N. apt. 232, 2 Metallistov ave . St.Petersburg / RU | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01980864.1 | 22.10.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001IL00969 | Priority number, date | US20000694429 | 23.10.2000 Original published format: US 694429 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0234446 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1345726 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345726 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/06, H01S3/30 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B23K26/0676 (EP,US);
B23K26/066 (EP,US);
B23K26/067 (EP,US);
B23K26/08 (EP,US);
B23K26/082 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | B23K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MEHRSTRAHLLASERBEARBEITUNG | [2009/17] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MULTI-BEAM LASER MACHINING | [2009/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR USINAGE LASER A FAISCEAUX MULTIPLES | [2009/17] |
Former [2003/39] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MEHRSTRAHLLASERBEARBEITUNG | ||
Former [2003/39] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MULTI-BEAM LASER MACHINING | ||
Former [2003/39] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR USINAGE LASER A FAISCEAUX MULTIPLES | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IT | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | IE | 22.10.2009 | LU | 22.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | FR | 30.11.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/35] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 22.10.2009 | ||
LU | 22.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 22.10.2009 | ||
LU | 22.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 22.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 22.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | SE | 30.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5055653 (FUNAMI KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 3-5,23 * figures 1-4,12; example 1 *; | [A]US5517000 (NISHIWAKI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,23,24* abstract *; | [Y]US5589955 (AMAKO JUN [JP], et al) [Y] 10,11,21 * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 64; figure -; example 1; claim - *; | [XY]DE19602307 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,16,17,24-26,29 * column 9, line 14 - column 10, line 25; figure 7 * [Y] 3-5,10,11,21,23 | International search | [A]US5796112 (ICHIE KOJI [JP]); | [X]US6037564 (TATAH ABDELKRIM [US]); | [Y]US6037967 (ALLEN PAUL C [US], et al) | by applicant | US6037564 |