Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1331215
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.06.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
13.02.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.11.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.08.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
08.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2005 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.10.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.06.2005 |
First examination report |
|
08.04.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
05.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
08.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.06.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
13.06.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
04.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.05.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
17.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|