EP1331215 - METHOD FOR SEPARATION OF REACTION PRODUCTS FROM CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1 Teppo-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1, Teppo-cho, Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAWARA, Michihiro 1654, Nakajima, Mitsu-cho Ibo-gun, Hyogo 671-1311 / JP | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01980912.8 | 25.10.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001JP09407 | Priority number, date | JP20000335177 | 01.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000335177 | [2003/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0236527 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331215 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07B63/00, C07C45/32, C07C45/80, C07C49/557, B01J38/00 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
B01J31/0247 (EP,US);
B01J31/40 (EP,US);
B01J31/4015 (EP,US);
C07C45/34 (EP,US);
C07C45/80 (EP,US);
B01J2531/845 (EP,US);
Y02P20/584 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/34, C07C49/637 (US,EP);
C07C45/34, C07C49/653 (EP,US);
C07C45/80, C07C49/653 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON REAKTIONSPRODUKTEN VON KATALYSATOREN | [2003/31] | English: | METHOD FOR SEPARATION OF REACTION PRODUCTS FROM CATALYSTS | [2003/31] | French: | PROCEDE POUR SEPARER DES PRODUITS DE REACTION CONTENUS DANS DES CATALYSEURS | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2003 | Translation filed | 30.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5030739 (FORICHER JOSEPH [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 50 - line 62; examples 1-7 *; | [A]US5847226 (MULLER BERNARD [CH], et al) [A] 1-7* example 1 * | International search | [X]EP0825165 (DAICEL CHEM [JP]); | [XP]JP2001288122 (DAICEL CHEM) |