EP1350186 - SYSTEM AND METHODOLOGY FOR PHOTO IMAGE CAPTURE, TAGGING, AND DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sitrick, David Sitrick & Sitrick 8340 North Lincoln Avenue, 201 Skokie, IL 60077 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Sitrick, David Sitrick & Sitrick 8340 North Lincoln Avenue, 201 Skokie, IL 60077 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/41] | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01981782.4 | 17.10.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001US32603 | Priority number, date | US20000691698 | 18.10.2000 Original published format: US 691698 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0233656 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1350186 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G09G5/00, H04N7/00 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
H04N21/4753 (EP);
H04N21/2146 (EP);
H04N21/278 (EP);
H04N21/8153 (EP);
H04N21/8352 (EP);
H04N7/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND METHODOLOGIE ZUM ERFASSEN, ETIKETTIEREN UND VERTEILEN VON FOTOBILDERN | [2003/41] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODOLOGY FOR PHOTO IMAGE CAPTURE, TAGGING, AND DISTRIBUTION | [2003/41] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR SAISIR, MARQUER ET DISTRIBUER DES IMAGES PHOTOGRAPHIQUES | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 30.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000023015 ; | [A]EP0640938 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-59 * the whole document *; | [X]US5666215 (FREDLUND JOHN RANDALL [US], et al) [X] 1-59 * abstract * * column 2, lines 21-56 * * column 3, lines 19-41 * * column 4, line 36 - column 6, line 18 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 7 * * column 8, lines 16-19 *; | [X]WO9810358 (GOLDBERG DAVID A [US]) [X] 1-59 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 1 - page 8, line 23 * * page 13, line 16 - page 18, line 32 *; | [X]WO0004711 (IMAGEID LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-59 * abstract * * page 1, lines 7-17 * * pages 2,7,9 * * page 12, line 1 - page 14, line 13 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000023015 A 20000121 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-59 * abstract * | [A] - "THE POWER OF METADATA IS PROPELLING DIGITAL IMAGING BEYOND THE LIMITATIONS OF CONVENTIONAL PHOTOGRAPHY", I3A RESOURCES (PUBLICATIONS, SPECIFICATIONS AND TOOLS), (199908), pages 1 - 7, XP001148750 [A] 1-59 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5384835 ; | [Y]US5477264 ; | [Y]US5617119 |