EP1328219 - BARREL-SHAPED APPARATUS FOR FUSING ADJACENT BONE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corp. 325 Corporate Drive Mahway, NJ 07430 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corp. 325 Corporate Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corp. 325 Corporate Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corp. 300 Commerce Court Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | ||
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corp. 58 Route 17 Allendale, NJ 07401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALKENHORST, Jared 64 Longview Avenue Fairfield, CT 06430 / US | 02 /
COHEN, Herb 9436 Lago Drive Boynton Beach, FL 33437-2752 / US | 03 /
MIDDLETON, Lance 490 Booth Hill Road Trumbull, CT 06610 / US | [2003/38] |
Former [2003/30] | 01 /
WALKENHORST, Jared 64 Longview Avenue Fairfield, CT 06430 / US | ||
02 /
COHEN, Herb 55 Mustang Drive Shelton, CT 06484 / US | |||
03 /
MIDDLETON, Lance 490 Booth Hill Road Trumbull, CT 06610 / US | Representative(s) | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2004/47] | Green, Mark Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [2003/30] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 01981785.7 | 18.10.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001US32608 | Priority number, date | US20000242843P | 24.10.2000 Original published format: US 242843 P | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0234170 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1328219 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
A61F2/446 (EP,US);
A61F2/30771 (EP,US);
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2817 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2835 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30286 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30785 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30787 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30828 (US);
A61F2002/30879 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30892 (EP,US);
A61F2002/448 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0063 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00017 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TONNENFÖRMIGE VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN ANEINANDER STOSSENDER KNOCHENSTRUKTUREN | [2003/30] | English: | BARREL-SHAPED APPARATUS FOR FUSING ADJACENT BONE STRUCTURE | [2003/30] | French: | APPAREIL EN FORME DE FUT POUR ASSURER LA FUSION AVEC DES STRUCTURES OSSEUSES ADJACENTES | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5683463 (GODEFROY JEAN [FR], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 25 * * figures 1,2,5,6; claim - *; | [A]US5785710 (MICHELSON GARY KARLIN [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 11, line 17 - line 58 * * column 13, line 7 - line 25 * * column 14, line 33 - column 15, line 15 * * figures 15-19,30,32,34-41; claims 3-79-13 *; | [A]US5876457 (PICHA GEORGE J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure -; claim - * |