EP1329141 - FINE FEATURED MOLDINGS OF LIQUID CRYSTALLINE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, Randal, D. 307 Rose Glen Lane Kennett Square, PA 19348 / US | 02 /
TASSI, Nancy, G. 98 Orchard Street Gibbstown, NJ 08027 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Morf, Jan Stefan Patentanwälte Abitz und Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/30] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01981882.2 | 16.10.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001US42745 | Priority number, date | US20000240996P | 17.10.2000 Original published format: US 240996 P | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0234017 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1329141 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329141 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/00, B29C45/00, B29C59/00 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
B29C45/372 (EP);
H05K1/00 (KR);
B29C37/0053 (EP);
B29C2059/023 (EP);
B29K2105/0079 (EP);
H05K3/0014 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/30] | H05K1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEINSTRUKTURIERTE FORMTEILE AUS FLÜSSIGKRISTALLPOLYMEREN | [2003/30] | English: | FINE FEATURED MOLDINGS OF LIQUID CRYSTALLINE POLYMERS | [2003/30] | French: | PIECES MOULEES A MOTIFS FINS CONSTITUEES DE POLYMERES A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 18.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5705254 (MORINAGA HISAKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 20 - line 40 * * column 5, line 42 *; | [X]US5736191 (BIERNATH ROLF W [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 19 - line 46 *; | [XA]EP0689927 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, line 5 - line 12 * * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 53 * [A] 2; | [XA]WO9635971 (EPIGEM LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1 * page 1 * * page 5 * * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 10 * * page 10, line 1 - line 5 * [A] 2; | [E]US6315937 (TAKEUCHI KAZUTAKA [JP], et al) [E] 1,2 * See the whole document * |