EP1341599 - CATALYST FOR PURIFYING EXHAUST GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | ||
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUTLER, Willard, A. 6 Churchill Place Big Flats, NY 14814 / US | 02 /
DAY, John, P. 116 Davenport Road Big Flats, NY 14814 / US | 03 /
LAKHWANI, Shahid, G. 21 Dreams South Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 04 /
OGUNWUMI, Steven, B. 137 Field Street 15 Corning, NY 14830 / US | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Skuhra, Udo ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Skuhra, Udo Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Skuhra, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | Poole, Michael John Corning Communications Ltd., Patent and Licensing Dpt., Quantum House, Maylands Avenue Hemel Hempstead, Herts. HP2 7DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01981887.1 | 15.10.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001US42752 | Priority number, date | US20000246483P | 06.11.2000 Original published format: US 246483 P | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0236254 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1341599 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1341599 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/00, B01J23/58, B01J23/63, C01B21/20, B01D53/94, F01N3/08 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
C04B35/44 (EP,US);
B01J23/38 (KR);
B01D53/865 (EP,US);
B01D53/9422 (EP,US);
B01J23/58 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
C04B35/117 (EP,US);
C04B35/462 (EP,US);
C04B35/465 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
B01D2255/102 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2022 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2042 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2045 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2047 (EP,US);
B01D2255/206 (EP,US);
B01D2255/91 (EP,US);
B01J37/0215 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3222 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3234 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3236 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/117, C04B35/44, C04B35/462, C04B35/465 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/37] | B01J8/00, B01J23/58, B01J23/63, C01B21/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR ZUR REINIGUNG VON ABGASEN | [2003/37] | English: | CATALYST FOR PURIFYING EXHAUST GASES | [2003/37] | French: | CATALYSEUR DESTINE A EPURER DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 03.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.08.2009 | IT | 12.08.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | GB | 12.11.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/05] | BE | 12.08.2009 | |
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
GB | 12.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | BE | 12.08.2009 | |
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 12.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5479191 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790824), vol. 3, no. 100, & JP54079191 A 19790623 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC NDI) [A] 1-4 * column A * | International search | [Y]US5948376 (MIYOSHI NAOTO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5082820 (MITSUI KIICHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4350613 (NISHINO ATSUSHI, et al); | [A]US4740408 (MOCHIDA SHIGERU [JP], et al) |