EP1344743 - BEER-DISPENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fifth Ocean Engineering Limited Themistokli Dervi, 48 Centennial Building, 3rd floor, Flat/Office 303 P.C. 2430 Nicosia / CY | [2006/27] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Belkin, Evgeny Konstantinovich ul. Marshala Meretskogo, 2-27 Moscow, 123298 / RU | ||
For all designated states Peshkin, Andrei Arkadievich ul. Surikova, 4-4 Moscow, 125080 / RU | |||
For all designated states Matveev, Vladimir Gennadievich pr. Vernadskogo, 89-90 Moscow, 117526 / RU | |||
For all designated states Prikhozhan, Leonid Mikhailovich pr. Vernadskogo, 105-2-234 Moscow, 117526 / RU | |||
For all designated states Artamonov, Jury Vasilievich ul. D.Bednogo, 11, p/o Suponevo Bryansk, 242020 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Belkin, Evgeny Konstantinovitch ul. Marshala Meretskogo, 2-27 123298 Moscow / RU | 02 /
Peshkin, Andrei Arkadievich ul. Surikova, 4-4 125080 Moscow / RU | 03 /
Matveev, Vladimir Gennadievich pr. Vernadskogo, 89-90 117526 Moscow / RU | 04 /
Prikhoshan, Leonid Mikhailovich pr. Vernadskogo, 105-2-234 117526 Moscow / RU | 05 /
Artamonov, Jury Vasilievich ul. D. Bednogo, 11, p/o Suponevo 242020 Bryansk / RU | [2006/27] |
Former [2003/38] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hano, Christian, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Hano, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01982973.8 | 23.10.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001RU00438 | Priority number, date | RU20000128893 | 21.11.2000 Original published format: RU 2000128893 | [2003/38] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0242198 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344743 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344743 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 30.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/04, B67D1/08 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
B67D1/0054 (EP);
B67D1/04 (EP);
B67D1/0406 (EP);
B67D1/0858 (EP);
B67D1/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/38] | B67D1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIERAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2003/38] | English: | BEER-DISPENSING DEVICE | [2003/38] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE BIERE | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2003 | Translation filed | 12.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 12.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 03.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2006 | 01.02.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | IE | 23.10.2006 | LU | 23.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2008/37] |
Former [2007/50] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
LI | 23.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2172876 (PAXMAN BRISTON COOLERS LTD); | [Y]DE4307415 (HANDKE WILHELM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * column 3, line 3 - line 63; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9728082 (LEEMING DOUGLAS RICHARD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 12, line 7 - line 15; figure 4 *; | [Y]WO9960092 (BASS PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 4; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]SU1142435 (PROIZV OB KIEVTORGMASH [SU]); | [Y]DE3539165 (MANSTEIN GERO); | [Y]WO9728082 (LEEMING DOUGLAS RICHARD [GB], et al); | [A]RU13369U |