EP1300000 - HALFTONE DOT PLACEMENT FOR MULTI-COLOR IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics, LLC 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | [2005/22] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics LLC 401 Merrit 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics LLC 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | ||
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Imation Corp. Legal Affairs, P.O. Box 64898 Saint Paul, MN 55164-0898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROZZI, William, A. P.O. Box 64898 Saint Paul, MN 55164-0898 / US | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01984204.6 | 11.01.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001US00871 | Priority number, date | US20000612419 | 07.07.2000 Original published format: US 612419 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0205545 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1300000 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1300000 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/52 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
H04N1/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | HALBTONPUNKTPLAZIERUNG FÜR MEHRFARBENBILDER | [2003/15] | English: | HALFTONE DOT PLACEMENT FOR MULTI-COLOR IMAGES | [2003/15] | French: | PLACEMENT DE POINTS SIMILI DESTINE A DES IMAGES MULTI-COULEURS | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 07.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0637886 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2; | [Y]EP0887998 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [A]US5341228 (PARKER KEVIN J [US], et al) [A] 16,17 * abstract *; | [A]EP0833499 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]EP0812102 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US5854882 (WANG SHENGE [US]) |