EP1305903 - WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEX (WDM) OPTICAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson AB Torshamnsgatan 23 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Ericsson AB Torshamnsgaten 23 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Ericsson AB Torshamnsgaten 23 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states M(DGP1) LTD New Century Park PO Box 53 Coventry CV3 1HJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Marconi UK Intellectual Property Ltd New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states MARCONI COMMUNICATIONS LIMITED New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUSH, Rosemary 'The Sundial', 335 Billing Road East Northampton NN3 3LL / GB | 02 /
WOOD, Nigel Paynters Wood Bungalow, Finmere Road, Evenley Brackley, Northants NN13 5SB / GB | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Collier, Ian Terry, et al Ericsson Limited Intellectual Property Group Maplewood Chineham Business Park, Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8YB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Collier, Ian Terry, et al Ericsson Limited Intellectual Property Group Maplewood Chineham Business Park Basingstoke Hampshire, RG24 8YB / GB | ||
Former [2005/23] | Collier, Ian Terry Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon, Essex SS14 3BA / GB | ||
Former [2003/18] | Collier, Ian Terry Marconi Intellectual Property Marrable House The Vineyards Gt. Baddow Chelmsford Essex CM2 7QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01984464.6 | 26.07.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001GB03399 | Priority number, date | GB20000018604 | 29.07.2000 Original published format: GB 0018604 | GB20000022605 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: GB 0022605 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0211336 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1305903 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1305903 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
H04J14/0283 (EP,US);
H04J14/0206 (EP,US);
H04J14/0226 (EP,US);
H04J14/0227 (EP,US);
H04J14/0246 (EP,US);
H04J14/025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES WELLENLÄNGENMULTIPLEXNETZWERK | [2003/18] | English: | WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEX (WDM) OPTICAL NETWORK | [2003/18] | French: | RESEAU OPTIQUE A MULTIPLEXAGE PAR REPARTITION EN LONGUEUR D'ONDE (MRL) | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 10.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2007 | BE | 02.05.2007 | CH | 02.05.2007 | CY | 02.05.2007 | DK | 02.05.2007 | FI | 02.05.2007 | IT | 02.05.2007 | LI | 02.05.2007 | NL | 02.05.2007 | TR | 02.05.2007 | IE | 26.07.2007 | LU | 26.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | SE | 02.08.2007 | GR | 03.08.2007 | ES | 13.08.2007 | PT | 02.10.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CY | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 26.07.2007 | ||
LU | 26.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CY | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 26.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 26.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 02.05.2007 | |
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 13.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5963348 (OEBERG MAGNUS [SE]) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 5 - line 7 * * column 2, line 16 - line 26 * * column 2, line 46 - column 7, line 46; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5999288 (ELLINAS GEORGIOS NICOS [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 13 - line 18 * * column 3, line 36 - line 65 ** column 4, line 66 - column 14, line 31; figures 2A,2B,3-8; tables I-IX *; | [A] - ELREFAIE A F, "MULTIWAVELENGTH SURVIVABLE RING NETWORK ARCHITECTURES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC). GENEVA, MAY 23 - 26, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930523), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-0950-2, pages 1245 - 1251, XP000371271 [A] 1-12 * page 1245, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 1245, column R, paragraph 4 - page 1246, column L, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 1247, column R, paragraph 1 - page 1248, column R, paragraph 2; figures 9,10,13; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1993.397474 |