EP1341861 - CROSSLINKED PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE COMPOSITONS, AND ADHESIVE ARTICLES BASED THEREON, USEFUL IN HIGH TEMPERATURE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Zhiming Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
ENGLE, Lori, P. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01984943.9 | 30.11.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001US45032 | Priority number, date | US20000250418P | 01.12.2000 Original published format: US 250418 P | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0244296 | Date: | 06.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1341861 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1341861 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
C09J133/066 (EP,US);
C09J133/08 (KR);
C08K5/3412 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,KR);
C09J11/06 (EP,US);
C09J4/00 (EP,US);
C09J7/385 (EP,US);
C09J2301/302 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2891 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/3412, C08L33/08 (EP,US);
C09D4/00, C08F220/1804 (US,KR,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERNETZTE HAFTKLEBEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN SOWIE AUF DIESEN BASIERENDE, FÜR HOCHTEMPERATURANWENDUNGEN VERWENDBARE KLEBENDE GEGENSTÄNDE | [2005/42] | English: | CROSSLINKED PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE COMPOSITONS, AND ADHESIVE ARTICLES BASED THEREON, USEFUL IN HIGH TEMPERATURE APPLICATIONS | [2003/37] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ADHESIVES RETICULEES SENSIBLES A LA PRESSION, ET ARTICLES ADHESIFS A BASE DE CELLES-CI, UTILES DANS DES APPLICATIONS A HAUTE TEMPERATURE | [2003/37] |
Former [2003/37] | VERNETZTE DRUCKEMPFINDLICHE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN SOWIE AUF DIESEN BASIERENDE, FÜR HOCHTEMPERATURANWENDUNGEN VERWENDBARE ARTIKEL | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 09.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2006 | BE | 15.02.2006 | CH | 15.02.2006 | CY | 15.02.2006 | FI | 15.02.2006 | IT | 15.02.2006 | LI | 15.02.2006 | NL | 15.02.2006 | TR | 15.02.2006 | DK | 15.05.2006 | SE | 15.05.2006 | GR | 16.05.2006 | ES | 26.05.2006 | PT | 17.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
TR | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.02.2006 | |
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0551566 ; | [X]WO9313148 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-3,7,8 * * examples 8-10 * * page 9, line 3 - page 10, line 10 *; | [X]WO9731077 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-6 * * page 7, paragraph L * * example 5 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 14, Database accession no. 1993-112919, XP002211920 & JPH0551566 A 19930302 (SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * abstract * |