EP1320576 - BIODEGRADABLE FUNCTIONAL FLUID FOR MECHANIC DRIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEA GmbH Technologiezentrum, Emissionsfreie Antriebe, Carnotstrasse 1 10587 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states Tea GmbH Technologiezentrum, Emisionsfreie Antriebe, Carnotstrasse 1 10587 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOYDT, Mathias Limonenstrasse 16 12203 Berlin / DE | 02 /
HÖTGER, Michael Dambockstrasse 59 13503 Berlin / DE | 03 /
KLEEMANN, Jens Ilsestrasse 12 b 12053 Berlin / DE | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Bürger, Peter, et al IAV GmbH Ingenieurgesellschaft Auto und Verkehr Kauffahrtei 25 09120 Chemnitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Bürger, Peter, et al IAV GmbH Ingenieurgesellschaft Auto und Verkehr Kauffahrtei 25 09120 Chemnitz / DE | ||
Former [2003/26] | Bürger, Peter IAV GmbH, Ingenieurgesellschaft Auto und Verkehr, Kauffahrtei, 45 09120 Chemnitz / DE | Application number, filing date | 01985265.6 | 20.09.2001 | [2003/26] | WO2001DE03672 | Priority number, date | DE2000149175 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10049175 | [2003/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0224841 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1320576 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
C10M169/041 (EP,US);
C10M105/14 (EP);
C10M107/34 (EP);
C10M129/20 (EP);
C10M145/26 (EP);
C10M145/28 (EP);
C10M145/38 (EP);
C10M149/14 (EP);
C10M149/18 (EP);
C10M173/02 (EP,US);
C10M2201/02 (EP,US);
C10M2207/022 (EP,US);
C10M2207/0225 (EP,US);
C10M2207/044 (EP,US);
C10M2209/103 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1033 (EP,US);
C10M2209/104 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1045 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1055 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1065 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1075 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1085 (EP,US);
C10M2209/109 (EP,US);
C10M2209/1095 (EP,US);
C10M2217/00 (EP,US);
C10M2217/02 (EP,US);
C10M2217/04 (EP,US);
C10M2217/041 (EP,US);
C10M2217/044 (EP,US);
C10M2217/045 (EP,US);
C10N2020/01 (EP,US);
C10N2040/02 (EP,US);
C10N2040/135 (EP,US);
C10N2050/01 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M169/041, C10M105/14, C10M107/34, C10M129/20, C10M149/14 (EP,US);
C10M173/02, C10M129/20, C10M145/26, C10M145/28, C10M145/38, C10M149/14, C10M149/18 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2003/26] | C10M169/04, C10M173/02, C10N30/04, C10N30/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE FUNKTIONSFLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR MECHANISCHE ANTRIEBE | [2003/26] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE FUNCTIONAL FLUID FOR MECHANIC DRIVES | [2003/26] | French: | LIQUIDE FONCTIONNEL BIODEGRADABLE POUR ENTRAINEMENTS MECANIQUES | [2003/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 02.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 11.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3992312 (GENJIDA FUMIHIDE, et al) [A] 1-3,6,8,9 * column W *; | JPS5269876 [ ] (TOHOKU METAL IND LTD); | [AD]US4855070 (LEWIS WALTER E F [US]) [AD] 4 * column 5, line 27 - line 60 *; | [DA]EP0464491 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 7* page 4, line 1 - line 30 *; | [X]DE4311237 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,9 * example . *; | [X]US5401428 (KALOTA DENNIS J [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9 * column 2, line 20 - line 30; example - *; | [X]WO9516767 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 5,6 * page 1, line 36 - page 3, line 6; claims 1,3-5 *; | [X]WO9704052 (MONSANTO CO [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 12; examples 3,4 *; | [X]US5616544 (KALOTA DENNIS J [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8,9 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 65; examples 1-7,1012,14 *; | [X]US5942150 (HEUER LUTZ [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,9 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 5; example - * * column 5, line 24 - line 55 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1977-52827y, XP002201112 [A] 4 * abstract * | by applicant | GB164303 | US4855070 | EP0464491 | EP0596197 | US5401428 | DE19647554 |